Bojorquez et al v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Plaintiff: Andrew Bojorquez, Gilbert Bojorquez, Jonathan Wajszczuk, Denise De Herrera, Shannon Smith, Alexandria Duran, Maria Love, Royce Labauex, Samantha Weber, Salvador Gonzales, Lauren Nguyen, Ana Corrales, Alberto Valdivia Jimenez, Michael Angeles, Nicholas Garcia, Sariah Long-Smith, David Lee, James Gasper, Andrew Miller, Katherine Lee, Kaelin Chin, Jeffrey Menke, Mary Wilkins, Angelica Cozzini, Amanda Edwards, Nathaniel Cousar, Elizabeth Faught, Stephanie Perez, Eddie Ramirez, Lupe Linda Ramirez and Kiera Perry
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida doing business as Assurant, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03164
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings, #18 Response to Motion,,,, #27 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Michael Angeles, Andrew Bojorquez, Gilbert Bojorquez, Kaelin Chin, Ana Corrales, Nathaniel Cousar, Angelica Cozzini, Denise De Herrera, Alexandria Duran, Amanda Edwards, Elizabeth Faught, Nicholas Garcia, James Gasper, Salvador Gonzales, Royce Labauex, David Lee, Katherine Lee, Sariah Long-Smith, Maria Love, Jeffrey Menke, Andrew Miller, Lauren Nguyen, Stephanie Perez, Kiera Perry, Kiera Perry, Eddie Ramirez, Lupe Linda Ramirez, Shannon Smith, Alberto Valdivia Jimenez, Jonathan Wajszczuk, Samantha Weber, Mary Wilkins. (Prochaska, Jessica)
January 26, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION for Trial Motion for Jury Trial filed by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Wise, Andrew)
January 22, 2024 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Najla Archer (Signed), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration (Part 1 of 2 - A-1 - A-12), #3 Exhibit A to Declaration (Part 2 of 2 - A-13 - A-23), #4 Exhibit B-1 - B-23 to Declaration)(Wise, Andrew)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/12/2024. (pabsec, )
January 11, 2024 Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #24 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03164-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
January 11, 2024 Filing 24 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida All parties do not consent.. (Wise, Andrew)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 1/10/2024, GRANTING the #21 and #22 Motions for Extension of Time. Defendant has up to and including January 22, 2024 to file its reply to the #13 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Defendant has up to and including January 26, 2024 to file its response to the #19 Motion for Jury Trial. Text Only Entry (sbplc3)
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION for Trial Motion for Jury Trial by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Wise, Andrew)
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Wise, Andrew)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 1/2/2024. The parties shall file an executed #7 Consent Form by 1/16/2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc3)
December 29, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Trial Motion for Jury Trial by Plaintiffs Michael Angeles, Andrew Bojorquez, Gilbert Bojorquez, Kaelin Chin, Ana Corrales, Nathaniel Cousar, Angelica Cozzini, Denise De Herrera, Alexandria Duran, Amanda Edwards, Elizabeth Faught, Nicholas Garcia, James Gasper, Salvador Gonzales, Royce Labauex, David Lee, Katherine Lee, Sariah Long-Smith, Maria Love, Jeffrey Menke, Andrew Miller, Lauren Nguyen, Stephanie Perez, Kiera Perry, Kiera Perry, Eddie Ramirez, Lupe Linda Ramirez, Shannon Smith, Alberto Valdivia Jimenez, Jonathan Wajszczuk, Samantha Weber, Mary Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 2022 10 28 Letter to Assurant re Call, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2022 11 08 Letter to Assurant, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 2023 01 10 Letter to Assurant, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 2023 03 17 Email from RNovak re Additional Policies, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 2023 03 17 Email Response to RNovak from JBP, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 2023 03 17 Email Reply from RNovak, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2022 10 17 LOR to Assurant - Lee)(Prochaska, Jessica)
December 29, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Michael Angeles, Andrew Bojorquez, Gilbert Bojorquez, Kaelin Chin, Ana Corrales, Nathaniel Cousar, Angelica Cozzini, Denise De Herrera, Alexandria Duran, Amanda Edwards, Elizabeth Faught, Nicholas Garcia, James Gasper, Salvador Gonzales, Royce Labauex, David Lee, Katherine Lee, Sariah Long-Smith, Maria Love, Jeffrey Menke, Andrew Miller, Lauren Nguyen, Stephanie Perez, Kiera Perry, Kiera Perry, Eddie Ramirez, Lupe Linda Ramirez, Shannon Smith, Alberto Valdivia Jimenez, Jonathan Wajszczuk, Samantha Weber, Mary Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 20230317 Email from RNovak re Additional Policies, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff Declarations, #3 Exhibit 3 - 20221017 Exemplar LOR, #4 Exhibit 4 - 20221028 Letter to Assurant, #5 Exhibit 5 - 20221108 Letter to Assurant, #6 Exhibit 6 - 20230110 Letter to Assurant, #7 Exhibit 7 - 20230317 Email Response to RNovak, #8 Exhibit 8 - 20230317 Email Reply from RNovak)(Prochaska, Jessica)
December 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Peter A. Gibbins, Esq. by Peter A. Gibbins on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Michael Angeles(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Andrew Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Gilbert Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Kaelin Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Ana Corrales(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Nathaniel Cousar(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Angelica Cozzini(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Denise De Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Alexandria Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Amanda Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Elizabeth Faught(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Nicholas Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party James Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Salvador Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Royce Labauex(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party David Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Katherine Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Sariah Long-Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Maria Love(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Jeffrey Menke(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Andrew Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Lauren Nguyen(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Stephanie Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Eddie Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Lupe Linda Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Shannon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Alberto Valdivia Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Jonathan Wajszczuk(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Samantha Weber(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Gibbins added to party Mary Wilkins(pty:pla) (Gibbins, Peter)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 STATEMENT Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Michael Angeles, Andrew Bojorquez, Gilbert Bojorquez, Kaelin Chin, Ana Corrales, Nathaniel Cousar, Angelica Cozzini, Denise De Herrera, Alexandria Duran, Amanda Edwards, Elizabeth Faught, Nicholas Garcia, James Gasper, Salvador Gonzales, Royce Labauex, David Lee, Katherine Lee, Sariah Long-Smith, Maria Love, Jeffrey Menke, Andrew Miller, Lauren Nguyen, Stephanie Perez, Kiera Perry, Kiera Perry, Eddie Ramirez, Lupe Linda Ramirez, Shannon Smith, Alberto Valdivia Jimenez, Jonathan Wajszczuk, Samantha Weber, Mary Wilkins. (Prochaska, Jessica)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Wise, Andrew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael S. Burg on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Michael Angeles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Andrew Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Gilbert Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Kaelin Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Ana Corrales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Nathaniel Cousar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Angelica Cozzini(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Denise De Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Alexandria Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Amanda Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Elizabeth Faught(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Nicholas Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party James Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Salvador Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Royce Labauex(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party David Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Katherine Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Sariah Long-Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Maria Love(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Jeffrey Menke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Andrew Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Lauren Nguyen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Stephanie Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Eddie Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Lupe Linda Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Shannon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Alberto Valdivia Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Jonathan Wajszczuk(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Samantha Weber(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Burg added to party Mary Wilkins(pty:pla) (Burg, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B)(Wise, Andrew)
December 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Shane C. Fulton, Esq. by Shane C. Fulton on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Michael Angeles(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Andrew Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Gilbert Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Kaelin Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Ana Corrales(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Nathaniel Cousar(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Angelica Cozzini(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Denise De Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Alexandria Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Amanda Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Elizabeth Faught(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Nicholas Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party James Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Salvador Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Royce Labauex(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party David Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Katherine Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Sariah Long-Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Maria Love(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Jeffrey Menke(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Andrew Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Lauren Nguyen(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Stephanie Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Eddie Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Lupe Linda Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Shannon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Alberto Valdivia Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Jonathan Wajszczuk(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Samantha Weber(pty:pla), Attorney Shane C. Fulton added to party Mary Wilkins(pty:pla) (Fulton, Shane)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jessica B. Prochaska, Esq. by Jessica Prochaska on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Michael Angeles(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Andrew Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Gilbert Bojorquez(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Kaelin Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Ana Corrales(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Nathaniel Cousar(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Angelica Cozzini(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Denise De Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Alexandria Duran(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Amanda Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Elizabeth Faught(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Nicholas Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party James Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Salvador Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Royce Labauex(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party David Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Katherine Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Sariah Long-Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Maria Love(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Jeffrey Menke(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Andrew Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Lauren Nguyen(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Stephanie Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Kiera Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Eddie Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Lupe Linda Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Shannon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Alberto Valdivia Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Jonathan Wajszczuk(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Samantha Weber(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Prochaska added to party Mary Wilkins(pty:pla) (Prochaska, Jessica)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Linda J. Knight on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of FloridaAttorney Linda J. Knight added to party American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida(pty:dft) (Knight, Linda)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/4/2023. Based on defendant's representation that the Court has jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, ECF No. #1 Paragraph 50, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) requires that each party file a disclosure of his citizenship. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) ("In an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement. The statement must name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party... when the action is filed in or removed to federal court."). "For purposes of federal diversity jurisdiction, an individual's state citizenship is equivalent to domicile." Smith v. Cummings, 445 F.3d 1254, 1259 (10th Cir. 2006). "To establish domicile in a particular state, a person must be physically present in the state and intend to remain there." Id. at 1260. "[A]llegations of mere 'residence' may not be equated with 'citizenship' for the purposes of establishing diversity." See Whitelock v. Leatherman, 460 F.2d 507, 514 (10th Cir. 1972). On or before 12/15/2023, plaintiffs shall file a disclosure statement in accordance with Rule 7.1 identifying their citizenship at the time of removal. Text Only Entry (sbplc3)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Wise, Andrew)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (ccuen, )
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER. Re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, by Judge Robert Gunning on 11/21/2023. (ccuen, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Case Cover Sheet, Counterclaim, Complaint and Jury Demand, and District Court Civil Summons upon American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida d/b/a Assurant, Inc. on 11/2/2023 (ccuen, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, filed by Kiera Perry(o/b/o S.M., a minor), Kaelin Chin, Maria Love, Nathaniel Cousar, David Lee, Gilbert Bojorquez, Andrew Bojorquez, James Gasper, Lupe Linda Ramirez, Sariah Long-Smith, Amanda Edwards, Elizabeth Faught, Stephanie Perez, Katherine Lee, Michael Angeles, Angelica Cozzini, Salvador Gonzales, Kiera Perry, Lauren Nguyen, Jeffrey Menke, Alberto Valdivia Jimenez, Mary Wilkins, Eddie Ramirez, Alexandria Duran, Jonathan Wajszczuk, Samantha Weber, Ana Corrales, Nicholas Garcia, Royce Labauex, Denise De Herrera, Andrew Miller, and Shannon Smith.(ccuen, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (ccuen, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2023-cv-30632. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9419699), filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bojorquez - Dec Page, #2 Exhibit B - American Bankers Division of Insurance, #3 State Court - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 State Court - District Court Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - District Court Civil Summons, #7 State Court - Affidavit of Service - American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, #8 State Court - Order Granting Defendant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida d/b/a Assurant, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ridley, Terence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bojorquez et al v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bojorquez
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Bojorquez
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wajszczuk
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise De Herrera
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Smith
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Duran
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Love
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royce Labauex
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Weber
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Gonzales
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Nguyen
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Corrales
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Valdivia Jimenez
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Angeles
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Garcia
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sariah Long-Smith
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gasper
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Miller
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Lee
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaelin Chin
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Menke
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wilkins
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Cozzini
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Edwards
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Cousar
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Faught
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Perez
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Ramirez
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Linda Ramirez
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiera Perry
Represented By: Jessica Prochaska
Represented By: Michael S. Burg
Represented By: Peter A. Gibbins
Represented By: Shane C. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida doing business as Assurant, Inc.
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Andrew J. H. Wise
Represented By: Linda J. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?