Greenleaf v. ACE American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Greenleaf
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv03172
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to #18 Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 1/31/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/4/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Plaintiff Daniel Greenleaf. (Shapiro, Stephen)
December 26, 2023 Filing 21 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by attorneys Amy M. Samberg & Alec H. Boyd. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE re Judicial Notice Request by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company (Boyd, Alec)
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Alec H. Boyd regarding MOTION to Dismiss #18 by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Boyd, Alec)
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company. (Boyd, Alec)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/7/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge.All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03172-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/7/2023. Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Dkt. #14 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 22, 2023.(norlin, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company. (Boyd, Alec)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant ACE American Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Boyd, Alec)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/5/2023. Due to a scheduling conflict, it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set on February 28, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET on March 4, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are reminded to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINTUE ORDER. (norlin, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dina Marie Bernardelli on behalf of Daniel GreenleafAttorney Dina Marie Bernardelli added to party Daniel Greenleaf(pty:pla) (Bernardelli, Dina)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen B. Shapiro on behalf of Daniel GreenleafAttorney Stephen B. Shapiro added to party Daniel Greenleaf(pty:pla) (Shapiro, Stephen)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of ACE American Insurance CompanyAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before February 14, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #7 ), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: February 28, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's counsel: Stephen B. Shapiro Dina M. Bernardelli Otteson Shapiro LLP 7979 E. Tufts Avenue, Suite 1600 Denver, CO 80237. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/1/2023. (norlin, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Return of Service, Delay Reduction Order, Pre-Trial Order and Discovery Protocol, and Webex Procedures upon ACE American Insurance on 11/17/2023 (efoga, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ACE American Insurance Company, filed by Daniel Greenleaf.(efoga, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for ACE American Insurance Company. (Boyd, Alec)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACE American Insurance Company from Denver, Case Number 2023cv033347. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9420374), filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Boyd, Alec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenleaf v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Greenleaf
Represented By: Dina Marie Bernardelli
Represented By: Stephen B. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Alec H. Boyd
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?