Gottfried v. University of Colorado Hospital Authority et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Micah Gottfried
Defendant: University of Colorado Hospital Authority, Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC a Colorado corporation doing business as UCHealth Medical Group doing business as UCHealth Mountain Crest Behavioral Center, Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC a Colorado corporation doing business as UCHealth Medical Group and Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc. a Colorado Non-Profit Corporation doing business as Poudre Valley Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03240
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12111 - Americans With Disabilities Act - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jtorr, )
February 5, 2024 Filing 29 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc., Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority, filed by Joseph Micah Gottfried. Filed per Chambers. (jtorr, )
February 2, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compliant Redline, #2 Exhibit Amended Compliant and Jury Demand)(Bellac, Patricia)
February 2, 2024 Filing 27 SUMMONS REQUEST as to POUDRE VALLEY HEALTH CARE, INC by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried. (Bellac, Patricia)
February 2, 2024 Filing 26 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc., Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority, filed by Joseph Micah Gottfried. Filed per Chambers.(jtorr, )
February 2, 2024 Filing 25 Administrative Notice re: #24 Summons Request filed by attorney Patricia S. Bellac. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and is not issued. Each summons caption must list all parties. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event "Summons Request." (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
February 1, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to POUDRE VALLEY HEALTH CARE, INC by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried. (Bellac, Patricia)
January 31, 2024 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority. (McEwen, Charlotte)
January 26, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compliant Redline, #2 Exhibit Amended Compliant and Jury Demand)(Bellac, Patricia)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/18/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 20 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03240-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (schap, )
January 17, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendants Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority. (McEwen, Charlotte)
January 17, 2024 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried All parties do not consent.. (Bellac, Patricia)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot #11 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss. Upon Plaintiff's filing of #16 Notice of filing of Amended Complaint, #11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is MOOT. See, e.g., Gilles v. United States, 906 F.2d 1386, 1389 (10th Cir. 1990) ("a pleading that has been amended under Rule 15(a) supersedes the pleading it modifies" (internal quotation marks omitted)). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Dkt No. 16-2 as the operative complaint. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/5/2024. Text Only Entry(stvlc5, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Compliant Redline, #2 Exhibit Amended Compliant and Jury Demand)(Bellac, Patricia)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support . For good cause shown, Plaintiff's respone to the motion to dismiss will be due on January 12, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/28/2023. Text Only Entry(stv, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Plaintiff Joseph Micah Gottfried. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bellac, Patricia)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patricia S. Bellac on behalf of Joseph Micah GottfriedAttorney Patricia S. Bellac added to party Joseph Micah Gottfried(pty:pla) (Bellac, Patricia)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Christine Knapp on behalf of Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital AuthorityAttorney Amy Christine Knapp added to party Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Christine Knapp added to party University of Colorado Hospital Authority(pty:dft) (Knapp, Amy)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Defendants Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McEwen, Charlotte)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charlotte L. McEwen on behalf of Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority (McEwen, Charlotte)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathon Michael Watson on behalf of Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital AuthorityAttorney Jonathon Michael Watson added to party Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathon Michael Watson added to party University of Colorado Hospital Authority(pty:dft) (Watson, Jonathon)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 1/24/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/31/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/11/2023. (schap, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. By District Court Judge, Larimer County, on 11/21/2023. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC, University of Colorado Hospital Authority, filed by Joseph Micah Gottfried.(tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McEwen, Charlotte)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by University of Colorado Hospital Authority, a body corporate and political subdivision of the State of Colorado, Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC d/b/a UCHealth Medical Group d/b/a UCHealth Mountain Crest Behavioral Center, a Colorado corporation from Colorado State Court, Larimer County, Colorado, Case Number 23CV30873. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9433373), filed by University of Colorado Hospital Authority, a body corporate and political subdivision of the State of Colorado, Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC d/b/a UCHealth Medical Group d/b/a UCHealth Mountain Crest Behavioral Center, a Colorado corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D-Notice Judicial Civil Case Management, #6 Exhibit E-Waiver of Service UCHA, #7 Exhibit F-Waiver of Service Poudre, #8 Exhibit G-Motion for Response Extension (UCHealth), #9 Exhibit H-Proposed Order re Motion for Response Extension (UCHealth), #10 Exhibit I-Order re Motion for Extension of Time)(McEwen, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottfried v. University of Colorado Hospital Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Micah Gottfried
Represented By: Patricia S. Bellac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Colorado Hospital Authority
Represented By: Charlotte L. McEwen
Represented By: Amy Christine Knapp
Represented By: Jonathon Michael Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC a Colorado corporation doing business as UCHealth Medical Group doing business as UCHealth Mountain Crest Behavioral Center
Represented By: Charlotte L. McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre Valley Medical Group, LLC a Colorado corporation doing business as UCHealth Medical Group
Represented By: Amy Christine Knapp
Represented By: Jonathon Michael Watson
Represented By: Charlotte L. McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc. a Colorado Non-Profit Corporation doing business as Poudre Valley Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?