Googins v. CF&I Steel, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Lowell F Googins
Defendant: CF&I Steel, L.P. and Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv03241
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Labor
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cash K. Parker terminated by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/9/2024. Text Only Entry(evaug )
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service via Email re #21 Order sent to Fremont County District Court.(jrobe, )
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 01/05/2024. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Remand to State Court (Doc. No. #17 ) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to Freemont County District Court, and the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith transmit the case file to Freemont County District Court and terminate this action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Union Pacific's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #12 ) and Defendant CF&I Steel, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time (Doc. No. #18 ) are DENIED as moot.(jrobe, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Parker, Cash)
January 5, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacob Russell Woods on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad CompanyAttorney Jacob Russell Woods added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft) (Woods, Jacob)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant CF&I Steel, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Rohner, Daniel)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Lowell F Googins. (Slater, Daniel)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Union Pacific Railroad Company by Plaintiff Lowell F Googins (Slater, Daniel)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant CF&I Steel, L.P.. CF&I Steel, L.P. answer due 1/5/2024. (Rohner, Daniel)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Anthony Williams on behalf of CF&I Steel, L.P.Attorney Paul Anthony Williams added to party CF&I Steel, L.P.(pty:dft) (Williams, Paul)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Edward Rohner on behalf of CF&I Steel, L.P.Attorney Daniel Edward Rohner added to party CF&I Steel, L.P.(pty:dft) (Rohner, Daniel)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Parker, Cash)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Submission of State Court Docket by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Order from State Court)(Parker, Cash)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 2/5/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/5/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/11/2023. (evaug)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Bernard Slater on behalf of Lowell F GooginsAttorney Daniel Bernard Slater added to party Lowell F Googins(pty:pla) (Slater, Daniel)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant Union Pacific Railroad CompanysUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Answer To Complaint. By District Court Judge, Fremont County, on 11/29/2023. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint Under Rule 105, and District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim or Third Party Complaint and Jury Demand upon Union Pacific Railroad Company on 11/08/2023. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT Under Rule 105 against CF&I Steel, L.P., Union Pacific Railroad Company, filed by Lowell F Googins.(tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit H- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Parker, Cash)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Union Pacific Railroad Company from Fremont County District Court, Case Number 2023CV30126. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9433378), filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Parker, Cash)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Googins v. CF&I Steel, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell F Googins
Represented By: Daniel Bernard Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF&I Steel, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Rohner
Represented By: Paul Anthony Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Cash K. Parker
Represented By: Jacob Russell Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?