Butler v. Riverside Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daimeon Butler
Defendant: Riverside Transport, Inc. and Riverside Staffing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03242
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2/2/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Appear Telephonically for the Planning/Scheduling Conference #18 is GRANTED. However, rather than by telephone, Counsel for Defendants may appear by video teleconference ("VTC") at the Scheduling Conference. Utilizing the instructions provided herein.(dgumb, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Riley Brehm on behalf of Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc.Attorney Andrew Riley Brehm added to party Riverside Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Riley Brehm added to party Riverside Transport, Inc.(pty:dft) (Brehm, Andrew)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the Planning/Scheduling Conference filed by Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/31/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the Planning/Scheduling Conference by Defendants Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc.. (Finklea, Alvin)
January 26, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE Filing of Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Daimeon Butler (Rath, Rydge)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rydge Robert Rath on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Rydge Robert Rath added to party Daimeon Butler(pty:pla) (Rath, Rydge)
January 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 7 January 2024. (cmadr, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #5 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc..(Finklea, Alvin)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sterling J. LeBoeuf on behalf of Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc.Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party Riverside Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party Riverside Transport, Inc.(pty:dft) (LeBoeuf, Sterling)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 12/11/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/6/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2024 at 09:30 a.m. in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Preparation of Scheduling Order, #2 Scheduling Order, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) Modified to correct text on 12/11/2023 (jtorr, ).
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victoria Elizabeth Guzman on behalf of Daimeon ButlerAttorney Victoria Elizabeth Guzman added to party Daimeon Butler(pty:pla) (Guzman, Victoria)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Miller on behalf of Daimeon ButlerAttorney David H. Miller added to party Daimeon Butler(pty:pla) (Miller, David)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/11/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, District Court (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, or Third-Party Complaint and Jury Demand upon Riverside Staffing Services, Inc. on 11/15/2023. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Process Server of Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Riverside Transport, Inc. on 11/09/2023. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc., filed by Daimeon Butler.(tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Finklea, Alvin)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc. from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2023CV32110. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9433567), filed by Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Delay Reduction Order, #3 Exhibit C - Division 204 Order re Pretrial Matters and Discovery Protocol, #4 Exhibit D - Register of Actions and Party Information, #5 Exhibit E - ROS on Riverside Staffing Services, Inc., #6 Exhibit F - ROS on Riverside Transport, Inc., #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finklea, Alvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Riverside Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daimeon Butler
Represented By: David H. Miller
Represented By: Rydge Robert Rath
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Alvin Jackson Finklea, III
Represented By: Andrew Riley Brehm
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Staffing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alvin Jackson Finklea, III
Represented By: Andrew Riley Brehm
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?