Crawford v. University of Colorado Hospital Authority
Plaintiff: Jerrod A Crawford and Jerrod Crawford
Defendant: University of Colorado Health Authority and University of Colorado Hospital Authority
Case Number: 1:2023cv03244
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerrod Crawford. University of Colorado Hospital Authority served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Receipt for Service)(Crawford, Jerrod)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Jerrod Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOCUMENT 1 History #34-39 (Leader Recognitions from Holly Knaub), #2 Exhibit DOCUMENT 2 History #40-41 (Leader Recognitions from Jack Retzlaff), #3 Exhibit Document 4 PT Feedback October EXCEL, #4 Exhibit DOCUMENT 5 Patient Experience November, #5 Exhibit DOCUMENT 6 MCR November Feedback, #6 Exhibit DOCUMENT 7 Patient Experience decemeber, #7 Exhibit DOCUMENT 8 MCR Fiscal YTD Scores, #8 Exhibit DOCUMENT 9 Patient Experience Feedback April, #9 Exhibit DOCUMENT 10 Patient Experience April Feedback and Scores, #10 Exhibit DOCUMENT 11 Email post Alan harassment 2, #11 Exhibit DOCUMENT 12 UCHA TO EEOC, #12 Exhibit DOCUMENT 13 Mediation TRANSCRIPT, #13 Exhibit DOCUMENT 14 ALAN TEXTS, #14 Exhibit DOCUMENT 15 UCHealth Radiation Safety Manual 2021 v1(3)(1), #15 Exhibit DOCUMENT 16 SCHEDULE TRIAL HK EXCITED, #16 Exhibit DOCUMENT 17 data for schedule change, #17 Exhibit DOCUMENT 18 MM LIES ABOUT RESPONSE OUTBOX KNAUB ROC 62721 ROC addition, #18 Exhibit DOCUMENT 20 My interpretation of events, #19 Exhibit DOCUMENT 21 FW End of day ambient found a spill 61521, #20 Exhibit DOCUMENT 22 RE Question about daily ambient surveys, #21 Exhibit DOCUMENT 23 TRANSCRIPT for Compliance, #22 Exhibit DOCUMENT 23A TRANSCRIPT of Greeley Bathroom 1830, #23 Exhibit DOCUMENT 24 TRANSCRIPT Meeting with Alan and Angie#2, #24 Exhibit DOCUMENT 25 SEAMON & CHRIS, #25 Exhibit DOCUMENT 26 IN-111 CALCULATION, #26 Exhibit DOCUMENT 27 timeline, #27 Exhibit DOCUMENT 28 RETALIATION JOINT COMMISSION, #28 Exhibit DOCUMENT 29 TEXT WITH ENGINEER, #29 Exhibit DOCUMENT 30 Infection Control, #30 Exhibit DOCUMENT 31 14MAY2021 AFTER CALLING INFECTION CONTROL, #31 Exhibit DOCUMENT 32 Disposable gown update, #32 Exhibit DOCument 33 Infection Control (not soiled), #33 Exhibit DOCUMENT 34 Regulated infectious (EMILY THORPE), #34 Exhibit DOCUMENT 35 Most frequently asked questions concerning the bloodborne pathogens standard | Occupational Safety a, #35 Exhibit DOCUMENT 36 Chris Question about restricted areasRadioactive material, #36 Exhibit DOCUMENT 37 (MEMO) Question about pay for 53021, #37 Exhibit DOCUMENT 38 HOLLY SAYS NO CHANGE TO SCHEDULE, I ASKED FOR 100% CALL Re Meeting for schedules, #38 Exhibit DOCUMENT 39 investigative leave, #39 Exhibit DOCUMENT 40 TRANSCRIPT Kalisher, #40 Exhibit DOCUMENT 41 Query about toilet INBOX DEWOLFE JAMES 62321, #41 Exhibit DOCUMENT 42 Asking Holly to involve HR, #42 Exhibit DOCUMENT 43 JC and AM locked computer, #43 Exhibit DOCUMENT 44 MELODY ASKED ME TO LOOK AT SCHEDULE INBOX 62421 JULIA SOLANO Found needle in lead container, #44 Exhibit DOCUMENT 45 HR GASLIGHTING ABOUT RECORD OF CONVERSATION, #45 Exhibit DOCUMENT 46 no followed behind me on this one because of ongoing HIPAA investigation FW Minor spill, #46 Exhibit DOCUMENT 47 SPILL INSTRUCTION, #47 Exhibit DOCUMENT 48 SPILL F/U 16june21 Mel and Marcy Mundo, #48 Exhibit DOCUMENT 49 IMPERVIOUS | definition in the Cambridge English Dictionary, #49 Exhibit DOCUMENT 50 SPILL INSTRUCTION, #50 Exhibit DOCUMENT 51 RLS 2021, #51 Exhibit DOCUMENT 52 2018-2019 apprasial, #52 Exhibit DOCUMENT 53 #1 RESPONSE TO CLOCK OUT HK, #53 Exhibit DOCUMENT 54 JC ASKS FOR GUIDANCE Fw Time zones for end of day studies, #54 Exhibit DOCUMENT 55 FIRST PT RESCHEDULED OUTBOX KNAUB 62721 updates for 41621, #55 Exhibit DOCUMENT 56 DON'T STAY PAST 1800, #56 Exhibit DOCUMENT 57 follow up from todays discussion, #57 Exhibit DOCUMENT 58 Re follow up from todays discussion, #58 Exhibit DOCUMENT 59 MEETING WITH MARCY MUNDO AND ANGIE 17may21, #59 Exhibit DOCUMENT 60 Breakdown of termination form update, #60 Exhibit DOCUMENT 61 RE Current time card stuffp, #61 Exhibit DOCUMENT 61A TERMINATION FORM, #62 Exhibit DOCUMENT 62 Late clock out 62321, #63 Exhibit DOCUMENT 63 OUTBOX 62521ALAN MCPHERSON New number, #64 Exhibit DOCUMENT 64 INBOX 62521 MARCY MUNDO PointsQuestions about our meeting, #65 Exhibit DOCUMENT 65 INBOX Marcy Mundo Question about pay for 53021, #66 Exhibit DOCUMENT 66 HK RETALIATION INBOX JULIA 7121Time card query, #67 Exhibit DOCUMENT 67 HK knew about harassment, #68 Exhibit DOCUMENT 68 6MAY21 Late clock out 552021 explained to HK, #69 Exhibit DOCUMENT 69 Current time card stuffp, #70 Exhibit DOCUMENT 70 Alans last words, #71 Exhibit DOCUMENT 71 Yahoo Mail - OUTBOX SOLANO 6/27/21, #72 Exhibit DOCUMENT 72 Record of conversation 2June21-1, #73 Exhibit DOCUMENT 73 Record of conversation 2June21-2, #74 Exhibit DOCUMENT 74 UCHA TIME KEEPING POLICY, #75 Exhibit DOCUMENT 75 not told explainations weren't good enough, #76 Exhibit DOCUMENT 76 16june21 Mel and Marcy Mundo, #77 Exhibit DOCUMENT 77 Pierson says alan is unprofessional Fw 61021 FOLLOW UP EMAIL WHERE MP STATES THAT BOTH ALAN AND I HAVE BEEN exhibiting unprofessional behavior regarding communication, #78 Exhibit DOCUMENT 78 (BONE SCAN ISSUE WITH ALAN), #79 Exhibit DOCUMENT 79 History #2 (ANNUAL REVIEW OF ALAN), #80 Exhibit DOCUMENT 80 MARY WIRTA TALKS TO AM 62321, #81 Exhibit DOCUMENT 81 JC-MP Greeley NMIS, #82 Exhibit DOCUMENT 82 Nuclear Medicine Technologist Scope of Practice and Performance Standards | Journal of Nuclear Medic, #83 Exhibit DOCUMENT 83 asrt-practice-standards-for-medical-imaging-and-radiation-therapy, #84 Exhibit DOCUMENT 84 INBOX Julia My apologies, #85 Exhibit DOCUMENT 85 Greeley photos, #86 Exhibit DOCUMENT 86 transcript 1st departmental meeting 9JUNE2021, #87 Exhibit DOCUMENT 87 Fw Banned from MCR, #88 Exhibit DOCUMENT 88 INVESTIGATIVE LEAVE, #89 Exhibit DOCUMENT 89 9AUG21 PHONE CALLS/ EMAILS/APPT, #90 Exhibit DOCUMENT 90 Ms Taylor mosebar paid leave Employee 67017, #91 Exhibit DOCUMENT 91 (HIPAA rule false) Missing charges_Redacted, #92 Exhibit DOCUMENT 92 PAPER FINAL draft 1, #93 Exhibit DOCUMENT 93 Meetings, #94 Exhibit DOCUMENT 94 3 YEARS at UCHA, #95 Exhibit DOCUMENT 95 (HIPAA RULES WRONG )NM PERFUSION WITH SHUNT, #96 Exhibit DOCUMENT 96 HIPAA FINAL, #97 Exhibit DOCUMENT 97 ALAN FU BEHIND ME ABOUT A HIDA ON CALL, #98 Exhibit DOCUMENT 98 Follow up for HIDA 2Aug2021, #99 Exhibit DOCUMENT 99 PART 2 ALAN 73121 HIDA, #100 Exhibit DOCUMENT 100 Alan f/u for HIDA Dose, #101 Exhibit DOCUMENT 101 Patients and Friends, #102 Exhibit DOCUMENT 102 TEXT WITH VU, #103 Exhibit DOCUMENT 103 HIDA F/U EXPLAINATION, #104 Exhibit DOCUMENT 104 FW URGENT Mebrofenin availability ordering guidelines through August 26 2021, #105 Exhibit DOCUMENT 105 RON RL 62521ALAN MCPHERSON New number, #106 Exhibit DOCUMENT 106 INBOX 62521 MARCY MUNDO PointsQuestions about our meeting, #107 Exhibit DOCUMENT 107 CALL LIST, #108 Exhibit DOCUMENT 108 INITIAL UCHA CLAIM, #109 Exhibit DOCUMENT 109 Joint commission RECORD, #110 Exhibit DOCUMENT 110 TEXT WITH ENGINEER, #111 Exhibit DOCUMENT 111 UCHA RULE INCONSISTENT copy, #112 Exhibit DOCUMENT 112 LIST OF REASONS 67017 List, #113 Exhibit DOCUMENT 113 JC ASKED FOR HELP OUTBOX PIERSON 62721 PM responsibilities, #114 Exhibit DOCUMENT 114 DON'T TALK TO HOLLY, BUT AM CAN RE Future correspondence with Holly and Alan, #115 Exhibit DOCUMENT 115 HOLLY RUDE THANKSGIVING Fwd Conversation with Alan, #116 Exhibit DOCUMENT 116 ALAN NOT PUNISHED FOR MAKING MISTAKE RE Decay room, #117 Exhibit DOCUMENT 117 JC and AM locked computer, #118 Exhibit DOCUMENT 118 PM responsibilities, #119 Exhibit DOCUMENT 119 R/L COMPLAINT INBOX 6242021 MARCY MUNDO Log off CPUWalk through Imaging rooms, #120 Exhibit DOCUMENT 120 POWERS KIMBERLY don't enter through door, #121 Exhibit DOCUMENT 121 Alans last words)(Crawford, Jerrod)
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk of Court re: Service of Process of #7 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Rule 4, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(cmadr, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dgumb, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Order. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, the case has been directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-3244-KAS. (Text only entry.) (dgumb, )
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DRAWING CASE. It is ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 1/16/2024. (dgumb, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against University of Colorado Hospital Authority, filed by Jerrod Crawford.(dgumb, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 109442 (dgumb, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against University of Colorado Hospital Authority, filed by Jerrod A Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Complaint of Discrimination, #2 Colorado Civil Rights Division - Complaint of Discrimination)(dgumb, )
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/11/2023. (dgumb, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 Conventionally Submitted Material : One Flash Drive with Exhibits to Complaint #1 by Plaintiff Jerrod A Crawford. Location of stored items: Clerk's Office Box A-1-9. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against University of Colorado Health Authority, filed by Jerrod A Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(efoga, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. University of Colorado Hospital Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrod A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrod Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Colorado Health Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Colorado Hospital Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?