Konecny (PS) v. Big M Casino, The et al
Plaintiff: J. Alan Konecny
Defendant: Big M Casino, The, George Freeland, Dana Goodell, Henry Sujana, Edward D. Buckley, Jr. and Clement Rivers
Case Number: 1:2023cv03250
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 20 Pro se LETTER by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 19 Plaintiff Original COMPLAINT for Violation of U.S. Admiralty Maritime Law against Big M Casino, The, Edward D. Buckley, Jr, George Freeland, Dana Goodell, Clement Rivers, Henry Sujana,, filed by J. Alan Konecny. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(sphil, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Service of Process by US Marshall by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (Attachments: #1 USM Service Form, #2 USM Service Form)(sphil, )
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 Motion to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 1/12/2024. Plaintiffs motions pending at ECF Nos. 10, 11, 13, and 14 are denied without prejudice as premature because this action remains under initial review.(sphil, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Electronic and Email Notification and to Appear by Video by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Service of Process by US Marshall by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (Attachments: #1 USM Service Form, #2 USM Service Form)(sphil, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Preserve for Appeal by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/14/2023. Plaintiff's pending motions (ECF Nos. 4, 5, 6, 7) are DENIED without prejudice as premature because this action remains under initial review..(sphil, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process by US Marshall by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Electronic and Email Notification and to Appear by Video by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Preserve for Appeal by Plaintiff J. Alan Konecny. (sphil, )
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/11/2023. (sphil, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (dgumb, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF U.S. ADMIRALTY MARITIME LAW against Big M Casino, The, Edward D. Buckley, Jr, George Freeland, Dana Goodell, Clement Rivers, Henry Sujana, filed by J. Alan Konecny.(dgumb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dgumb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konecny (PS) v. Big M Casino, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Alan Konecny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big M Casino, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Sujana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward D. Buckley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?