Lopez v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez
Defendant: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03308
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr Diversity - Labor
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Wesley Reichart, III on behalf of Marriott International, Inc.Attorney William Wesley Reichart, III added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reichart, William)
February 13, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Paul O'Day on behalf of Marriott International, Inc.Attorney Michael Paul O'Day added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft) (O'Day, Michael)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 8 February 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #25 is GRANTED. Counsel for both sides may appear by video teleconference ("VTC") at the Scheduling Conference utilizing the instructions provided herein. (cmadr, )
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #25 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone or Videoconference - #12 Order, filed by Marriott International, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/7/2024. Text Only Entry (kmyha)
February 6, 2024 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone or Videoconference - #12 Order, by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Dew, Ellen)
February 6, 2024 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez. (Power, Brianne)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 February 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss #21 is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #19 is extended to February 16, 2024.(cmadr, )
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/1/2024. Text Only Entry (kmyha)
February 1, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez. (Power, Brianne)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marriott International, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/12/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 12, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Dew, Ellen)
January 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 7 January 2024. (cmadr, )
December 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, - Notice Pursuant To Local Civil Rule 81.1 by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket)(Dew, Ellen)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/22/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #14 Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03308-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute ORDER The signed Consent-Non-Consent Form #13 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 22 December 2023. (cmadr, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez All parties do not consent.. (Power, Brianne)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 20 December 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/6/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is January 30, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 12/20/2023. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brianne Michelle Power on behalf of Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez (Power, Brianne)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Dew, Ellen)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Marriot International, Inc.. Marriot International, Inc. answer due 1/12/2024. (Dew, Ellen)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond, be extended to and including January 12, 2024. By Christopher Giles Seldin, District Court Judge, Pitkin County, on 12/07/2023. (tgall, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim or Third Party Complaint, District Court Civil Summons, Class Action Complaint, and Exhibit 1 upon Marriot International, Inc. on 11/16/2023. (tgall, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Marriot International, Inc., filed by Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez.(tgall, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC from District Court, Pitkin County, Case Number 2023CV30109. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9446876), filed by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Tiffany Shafer, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #7 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit F - Stipulation to Extend Time, #9 Exhibit G - Proposed Order for Extension of Time, #10 Exhibit H -Order Granting Extension of Time, #11 Exhibit I - Register of Actions)(Dew, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Esteban Camas Lopez
Represented By: Brianne Michelle Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Paul O'Day
Represented By: William Wesley Reichart, III
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?