Aspen Skiing Company, LLC v. Perfect Moment Ltd.
Plaintiff: Aspen Skiing Company, LLC
Defendant: Perfect Moment LTD.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03355
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER This Matter is before the Court on #18 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND RELATED DEADLINES (the "Motion"). For good cause shown and to facilitate potential settlement between the parties, the Motion is GRANTED. Perfect Moment Ltd.'s answer or other response due 3/8/2024. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2024 is VACATED and RESET for 4/23/2024 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/17/2024. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/6/2024. Text Only Entry(stvlc4, )
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Perfect Moment Ltd. referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/6/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
February 6, 2024 Motions terminated: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, filed by Perfect Moment Ltd. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
February 5, 2024 Filing 18 ERRATA and attached substitute Motion by Defendant Perfect Moment Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Corrected Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer)(Ferguson, Matthew)
February 5, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Perfect Moment Ltd.. (Ferguson, Matthew)
January 22, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Lenhart Bohmann on behalf of Aspen Skiing Company, LLCAttorney Kathryn Lenhart Bohmann added to party Aspen Skiing Company, LLC(pty:pla) (Bohmann, Kathryn)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/19/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/28/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2024 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/19/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Perfect Moment Ltd... (Ferguson, Matthew)
January 18, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint for failing to comply fully with the Local Rules of Practice. The parties may file a renewed stipulation, or Defendant may file its answer or other responsive pleading, on or before 1/19/2024. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/18/2024. Text Only Entry (skclc3)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 CHANGE IN JUDICIAL OFFICER DESIGNATION. Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews as a United States District Judge, this action will now be updated to reflect his new designation as District Judge S. Kato Crews. District Judge Crews shall retain assignment to this action as presiding judge and Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is drawn as referral judge. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03355-SKC. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 STRICKEN STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Perfect Moment Ltd.. Perfect Moment Ltd. answer due 2/7/2024. (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 1/19/2024 to strike pursuant to 12 Minute Order. (jtorr, )
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sphil, )
December 29, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aspen Skiing Company, LLC. Perfect Moment Ltd. served on 12/27/2023, answer due 1/17/2024. (Saffer, Ian)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE re 5 Administrative Notice, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Aspen Skiing Company, LLC (Saffer, Ian)
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Saffer, Ian)
December 20, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Perfect Moment LTD. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Aspen Skiing Company, LLC. (Saffer, Ian)
December 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perfect Moment LTD. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9453506)Attorney Ian Lawrence Saffer added to party Aspen Skiing Company, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Aspen Skiing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saffer, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen Skiing Company, LLC v. Perfect Moment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Skiing Company, LLC
Represented By: Ian Lawrence Saffer
Represented By: Kathryn Lenhart Bohmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Moment LTD.
Represented By: Matthew C. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?