Searcy v. Gunter et al
Plaintiff: Deanna M Searcy
Defendant: Heidi Barron, Manapreet Basi, Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. d/b/a Jeffco Family Health Services, Jennifer Campbell, Jeffrey Gunter, Westside Womens Care Pllc, Douglas Minton, Manpreet Basi, Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. doing business as Jeffco Family Health Services, Westside Womens Care, PLLC and USA
Case Number: 1:2023cv03388
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 22 U.S.C. ยง 2702 - Medical Malpractice by Govt. Medical Personnel
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #25 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference or, in the Alternative, Convert it to a Status Conference referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/14/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
February 13, 2024 Filing 25 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference or, in the Alternative, Convert it to a Status Conference by Defendant USA. (Schulze, Leslie)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/12/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 12 February 2024. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent-Non-Consent Form [#22] indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). Case randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings shall be designated as 23-cv-03388-SKC-KAS. (cmadr, )
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USA All parties do not consent.. (Schulze, Leslie)
January 23, 2024 Filing 21 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #20 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney James Hallett Guest. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Hallett Guest on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney James Hallett Guest added to party Deanna M Searcy(pty:pla) (Guest, James)
January 22, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Phil Cody Pearson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Phil Cody Pearson added to party Deanna M Searcy(pty:pla) (Pearson, Phil)
January 18, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Schulze, Leslie)
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sierra Renee Ward on behalf of Jeffrey GunterAttorney Sierra Renee Ward added to party Jeffrey Gunter(pty:dft) (Ward, Sierra)
January 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Anthony Michalek on behalf of Jeffrey GunterAttorney Steven Anthony Michalek added to party Jeffrey Gunter(pty:dft) (Michalek, Steven)
January 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 7 January 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Substitute #11 is GRANTED. Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 233(c) & (g)-(l), the United States is substituted as Defendant in this case in place of the three Federal Defendants, i.e., Heidi Barron, P.A., Manpreet Basi, M.D., and Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the three Federal Defendants from the electronic docket and add the United States as a Defendant instead. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Extension #12 is GRANTED. The deadline for the United States to respond to the operative complaint is extended to January 19, 2024.(cmadr, )
January 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 6 January 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/4/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
January 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5] is February 26, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/6/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Heidi Barron, Manpreet Basi, Metro Community Provider Network, Inc.. (Schulze, Leslie)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendants Heidi Barron, Manpreet Basi, Metro Community Provider Network, Inc.. (Schulze, Leslie)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 3 January 2024. The Court hereby gives notice that Attorney Leslie Carol Schulze and I worked in the same unit at the Colorado Attorney General's Office from May 2022 to June 2023. Although I am fully confident that I am able to fairly, impartially, and disinterestedly adjudicate any issues that may come before me in this matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, if they so choose, any counsel representing parties in this case may file a motion to recuse no later than January 17, 2024. (cmadr, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephanie Natsuko McConkie on behalf of Jennifer CampbellAttorney Stephanie Natsuko McConkie added to party Jennifer Campbell(pty:dft) (McConkie, Stephanie)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Kelley Otto on behalf of Jennifer CampbellAttorney Katherine Kelley Otto added to party Jennifer Campbell(pty:dft) (Otto, Katherine)
December 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Amy Cook Olson by Amy E. Cook-Olson on behalf of Douglas Minton, Westside Womens Care, PLLCAttorney Amy E. Cook-Olson added to party Douglas Minton(pty:dft), Attorney Amy E. Cook-Olson added to party Westside Womens Care, PLLC(pty:dft) (Cook-Olson, Amy)
December 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Angela Klein by Angela Lund Klein on behalf of Douglas Minton, Westside Womens Care, PLLCAttorney Angela Lund Klein added to party Douglas Minton(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Lund Klein added to party Westside Womens Care, PLLC(pty:dft) (Klein, Angela)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Heidi Barron, Manpreet Basi, Jennifer Campbell, Jeffrey Gunter, Metro Community Provider Network, Inc., Douglas Minton, Westside Womens Care, PLLC, filed by Deanna M Searcy.(tgall, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. d/b/a Jeffco Family Health Services, Manapreet Basi, Heidi Barron from Jefferson County, Case Number 2023CV030369., filed by Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. d/b/a Jeffco Family Health Services, Manapreet Basi, Heidi Barron. (Attachments: #1 Summons and State Court Complaint, #2 DHS Deeming Letters, #3 Certification by United States Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Docket Sheet)(Schulze, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searcy v. Gunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna M Searcy
Represented By: James Guest
Represented By: Phil Cody Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Barron
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manapreet Basi
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. d/b/a Jeffco Family Health Services
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie Natsuko McConkie
Represented By: Katherine Kelley Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Gunter
Represented By: Sierra Renee Ward
Represented By: Steven Anthony Michalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Womens Care Pllc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Minton
Represented By: Angela Lund Klein
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpreet Basi
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Community Provider Network, Inc. doing business as Jeffco Family Health Services
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Womens Care, PLLC
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Angela Lund Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Leslie Carol Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?