National Association for Gun Rights et al v. Polis
Plaintiff: National Association for Gun Rights, Christopher James Hiestand Richardson, Max Edwin Schlosser, John Mark Howard and Rocky Mountain Gun Owners
Defendant: Jared S. Polis
Case Number: 1:2024cv00001
Filed: January 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ss - Fed. Question: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Jared S. Polis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Kotlarczyk, Michael)
February 27, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Samuel Perry Wolter on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Samuel Perry Wolter added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Wolter, Samuel)
February 15, 2024 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs John Mark Howard, National Association for Gun Rights, Christopher James Hiestand Richardson, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Max Edwin Schlosser All parties do not consent.. (Arrington, Barry)
February 9, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceeding held before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 2/9/2024 setting in person Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing for 3/14/2024 at 8:00 AM to 5:00 PM in Courtroom C202 (Denver), 3/15/2024 at 8:00 AM to 5:00 PM in Courtroom C202 (Denver) and Video Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing for Expert Testimony for 3/18/2024 at 8:00 AM to 5:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction). O Court Reporter: Erin Valenti. (dclem)
February 5, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: VTC Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 1:15 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher. For VTC log-in questions, email Donald_Clement@cod.uscourts.gov. The conference which had been set for 2/8/20204 is hereby VACATED. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on January 29, 2024. Text Only Entry (gpglc3, )
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate January 30, 2024 Status Conference: Conference is VACATED. In-person Scheduling Conference reset for 2/8/2024 at 8:15 AM in Byron Rogers Courtroom C202 before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on January 25, 2024. Text Only Entry(gpglc3)
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate January 30, 2024 Status Conference by Defendant Jared S. Polis. (Spalding, Kathleen)
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceeding held before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 1/18/2024. The Response deadline to complaint of March 8th, 2024, is vacated and all other scheduling dates will be reset as appropriate with parties submitting a joint scheduling brief. On or before February 28th, 2024, Defendants response to [D. 8] Motion for Preliminary Injunction is to be filed with the Court and Plaintiff's reply is due on or before March 9th, 2024. Set Video Status Conference for 1/30/2024 at 2:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction). Court Reporter: Erin Valenti. (dclem, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick L. Sayas on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Patrick L. Sayas added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Sayas, Patrick)
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen L. Spalding on behalf of Jared S. PolisAttorney Kathleen L. Spalding added to party Jared S. Polis(pty:dft) (Spalding, Kathleen)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: VTC or Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 9:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher. Plaintiffs seek a temporary restraining order (TRO) and preliminary injunction (PI) precluding enforcement of Colorado Revised Statute 18-12-111.5. As the effective date of the allegedly unconstitutional statutory section(s) is January 1, 2024, the Court sets this matter for a Scheduling Conference on January 18, 2024, at 9 a.m. NOTE: This is not a hearing for the TRO or PI Order. At this hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to discuss a briefing schedule for both the TRO and PI and be prepared to set a mutually convenient date for the preliminary injunction hearing. All parties may appear remotely for this hearing. The Parties shall contact Gallagher Chambers and specifically Donald_Clement@cod.uscourts.gov for VTC and telephone instructions. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on January 17, 2024. Text Only Entry (gpglc3)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 1/16/2024. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, )
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 9 Minute Order. Pursuant to Order or Memorandum. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00001-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (schap, )
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon the filing of #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to a District Judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/16/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
January 15, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs John Mark Howard, National Association for Gun Rights, Christopher James Hiestand Richardson, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Max Edwin Schlosser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Statute, #2 Howard Declaration, #3 Rhodes Declaration, #4 Richardson Declaration, #5 Schlosser Declaration)(Arrington, Barry)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by National Association for Gun Rights, John Mark Howard, Max Edwin Schlosser, Christopher James Hiestand Richardson, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners. Jared S. Polis waiver sent on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. (Arrington, Barry)
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (schap, )
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jared S. Polis by Plaintiffs John Mark Howard, National Association for Gun Rights, Christopher James Hiestand Richardson, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, Max Edwin Schlosser. (Arrington, Barry)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 2/15/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/22/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 2/29/2024 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/2/2024. (schap, )
January 1, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
January 1, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
January 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jared S. Polis (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9464734)Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party John Mark Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party National Association for Gun Rights(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Christopher James Hiestand Richardson(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Rocky Mountain Gun Owners(pty:pla), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Max Edwin Schlosser(pty:pla), filed by National Association for Gun Rights, John Mark Howard, Max Edwin Schlosser, Christopher James Hiestand Richardson, Rocky Mountain Gun Owners. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Arrington, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association for Gun Rights et al v. Polis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for Gun Rights
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Hiestand Richardson
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Edwin Schlosser
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mark Howard
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Gun Owners
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared S. Polis
Represented By: Kathleen L. Spalding
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Represented By: Patrick L. Sayas
Represented By: Samuel Perry Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?