Calderon v. Dillon Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Calderon
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers, Inc., Kroger Co., The and NAKS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00016
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 In light of the parties' #16 stipulation for dismissal of claims against Defendants The Kroger Co., and NAKS, LLS with prejudice, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendants The Kroger Co., and NAKS, LLC from this action. It is ORDERED that the #14 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant NAKS, LLC is DENIED AS MOOT by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/2/2024. Text Only Entry(kmyha)
February 1, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party The Kroger Co. and NAKS, LLC with Prejudice by Defendants Dillon Companies, LLC, Kroger Co., The. (Pratt, Katherine)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NAKS, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/16/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 12, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant NAKS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease)(Campbell, Colin)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin C. Campbell on behalf of NAKS, LLCAttorney Colin C. Campbell added to party NAKS, LLC(pty:dft) (Campbell, Colin)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/4/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/5/2024. (evaug)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/4/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 Defendants Dillon Companies, LLC and The Kroger Company's ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to #7 Complaint, by Dillon Companies, LLC, Kroger Co., The.(tgall, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, District Court Civil Summons, Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand upon NAKS, LLC on 12/05/2023. (tgall, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 PLAITIFF'S COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Dillon Companies, LLC, Kroger Co., The, NAKS, LLC, filed by Carlos Calderon.(tgall, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christy Noelle Redmond on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers, Inc., The Kroger Co.Attorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party The Kroger Co.(pty:dft) (Redmond, Christy)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pratt, Katherine)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Pratt, Katherine)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co., Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers, Inc. from Pueblo District Court, Case Number 23cv30530. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9469796), filed by The Kroger Co., Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit B- Summons to Dillon Companies, #5 Exhibit C -Summons to The Kroger Co., #6 Exhibit D - Summons to NAKS, #7 Exhibit E - Return of Service - Dillon Companies, #8 Exhibit F - Return of Service - The Kroger Co., #9 Exhibit G - Return of Service - NAKS, #10 Exhibit H - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Exhibit I - Defs. Dillon Companies and The Kroger Co.'s Answer and Jury Demand, #12 Exhibit J - Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report - Dillon Companies, LLC, #13 Exhibit K - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #14 Exhibit L - Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report - The Kroger Co., #15 Exhibit M - Cert of Good Standing and Periodic Report - NAKS, LLC, #16 Exhibit N - Entity Info for NAKS, LLC, #17 Exhibit O - State Court Docket Sheet, #18 Exhibit P - Entry of Appearance for Katherine M.L. Pratt and Christy N. Redmond)(Pratt, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon v. Dillon Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Christy Noelle Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co., The
Represented By: Christy Noelle Redmond
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAKS, LLC
Represented By: Colin C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?