Nairn v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Nairn
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00064
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Beer, Naomi)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2/28/2024. (dgumb, )
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/28/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
February 28, 2024 Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00064-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2/28/2024. This matter is before the Court on the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction [#19 ] (the "Consent/Non-Consent Form"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (dgumb, )
February 28, 2024 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. All parties do not consent.. (Beer, Naomi)
February 21, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Naomi Beer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Beer, Naomi)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2/15/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #16 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to February 21, 2024.(dgumb, )
February 9, 2024 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Beer, Naomi)
February 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by April Christine Connally on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.Attorney April Christine Connally added to party JPMorgan Chase & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney April Christine Connally added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Connally, April)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2/2/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #13 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to February 14, 2024.(dgumb, )
January 29, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Beer, Naomi)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. JPMorgan Chase & Co. answer due 1/30/2024; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 1/30/2024. (Beer, Naomi)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Neil Stephen Sullenberger on behalf of Christopher NairnAttorney Neil Stephen Sullenberger added to party Christopher Nairn(pty:pla) (Sullenberger, Neil)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11 January 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/6/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#8] is February 28, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/11/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
January 9, 2024 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Jury Demand, by Christopher Jay Baumann, District Court Judge, Denver County, on 01/03/2024. (blaws)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVITS of Service of Summons, Complaint upon JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service re: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA) (blaws)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Christopher Nairn. (blaws) Modified on 1/10/2024 to correct document title. (blaws)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Beer, Naomi)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Denver District Court State of Colorado, Case Number 2023CV33571. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9478647), filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Beer, Naomi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nairn v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Nairn
Represented By: Neil Stephen Sullenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: April Christine Connally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: April Christine Connally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?