Leonite Fund I, LP v. Hawaiian Springs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leonite Fund I, LP
Defendant: Hawaiian Springs, LLC and HSW Holdings Corporation
Receiver: Robert L Stevens
Case Number: 1:2024cv00149
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0754 - Receiver of Property in Different Districts
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Bond Posting by Receiver Robert L Stevens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Receipt)(Ashmore, Tracy)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: To facilitate the payment of the Receiver's bond in this matter pursuant to the Order Appointing Receiver, [Doc. #18 ], it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 15, 2024, the $1,000.00 bond shall be paid by the Receiver into the registry of the Court, see D.C.COLO.LCivR 67.2(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to accept the Receiver's tender of $1,000.00 for deposit in the Court's registry. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/08/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
February 5, 2024 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Oath of Receiver by Receiver Robert L Stevens. (Ashmore, Tracy)
February 1, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tracy L. Ashmore on behalf of Robert L StevensAttorney Tracy L. Ashmore added to party Robert L Stevens(pty:rc) (Ashmore, Tracy)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER Strongbow Advisors, Inc. and Robert L. Stevens (Mr. Stevens), individually, is appointed as Receiver over the Companies as detailed herein. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/1/2024.(norlin, )
February 1, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Leonite Fund I, LP. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/01/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/01/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
February 1, 2024 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to #13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00149-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (jrobe, )
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on review of #13 Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (the "Consent Form"), filed by Plaintiff. The Consent Form contains signatures of Plaintiff's counsel, the president of Defendant Hawaiian Springs LLC, and the president of Defendant HSW Holdings Corporation. No counsel has entered on behalf of either Defendant. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(6), an order of reference may be entered when "all parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction." Here, the two Defendants are both entities. "A corporation or other business entity can only appear in court through an attorney and not through a non-attorney corporate officer appearing pro se." Harrison v. Wahatoyas, L.L.C., 253 F.3d 552, 556 (10th Cir. 2001). Accordingly, the Court is unable to accept the signatures of Defendants' president, and no order of reference may enter. The Clerk of Court is instructed to reassign this matter to a District Judge. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/1/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP All parties consent.. (Garber, Aaron)
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/30/2024. ORDERED: The Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form shall be filed with the court containing all parties signatures as soon as possible. Once the consent form is filed, this court can then grant the receivership order. Once the court grants the receivership order, the court will require the receiver to file a status report within sixty (60) days of their appointment, and every ninety (90) days thereafter. FTR: A402. (morti, )
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge (the "Consent Form"). The Consent Form appears to have been signed by only Plaintiff's counsel, and Defendants have made no entry of appearance in this matter. Accordingly, the Court will not seek an order of reference at this time. In the event that a fully completed Consent Form is not submitted before the 1/30/2024 Status Conference, the Court will address the issue at that time. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/25/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Waiver of Service re: #7 Summons Issued, #2 Supplement/Amendment, #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP. (Garber, Aaron)
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP All parties consent.. (Garber, Aaron)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of the Docket. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form is due on or before 1/23/2024. A Status Conference is set for 1/30/2024 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Telephonic appearances will be permitted, and may be made by calling 571-353-2301 at the scheduled time and utilizing Meeting ID: 252821415#. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/18/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
January 18, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to HSW HOLDING CORPORATION re #2 Supplement/Amendment, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP. (Garber, Aaron)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hawaiian Springs, LLC re #2 Supplement/Amendment, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP. (Garber, Aaron)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Garber, Aaron)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Page by Plaintiff Leonite Fund I, LP. (Garber, Aaron)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9492286)Attorney Aaron A. Garber added to party Leonite Fund I, LP(pty:pla), filed by Leonite Fund I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E)(Garber, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonite Fund I, LP v. Hawaiian Springs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonite Fund I, LP
Represented By: Aaron A. Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Springs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSW Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robert L Stevens
Represented By: Tracy L. Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?