TeaHee LLC v. We Love Tea, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TeaHee LLC
Defendant: We Love Tea, LLC, T and Tea, LLC, We Love Tea, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as TeaHee Boba Littleton, T and Tea, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as TeaHee Boba Lakewood and Legacy HTLK, Inc. a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Tea-Hee Boba doing business as TeaHee Boba Thornton
Case Number: 1:2024cv00227
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Joint Motion to Stay. The Court stays all deadlines through April 4, 2024 and accordingly vacates the March 20, 2024 Scheduling Conference. On or before April 4, 2024, the Parties shall file a status report regarding the status of the Parties' settlement efforts and confirming whether the stay should be lifted. If the stay is lifted, within two weeks of the lift Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction and within five days of the lift the Parties shall contact Chief Magistrate Judge Hegarty's Chambers (hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) by joint email to reset the Scheduling Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/1/2024.(jtorr, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 Joint MOTION to Stay all Case Deadlines. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/01/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay all Case Deadlines and to Hold Case Open but in Abeyance through 4-4-2024 by Defendants Legacy HTLK, Inc., T and Tea, LLC, We Love Tea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hester, Allison)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for good cause shown. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint and respond to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on or before March 4, 2024. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/20/24. Text Only Entry(mehlc5)
February 20, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/20/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
February 16, 2024 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Certificate of Compliance re: Consultation on Motion by Defendants Legacy HTLK, Inc., T and Tea, LLC, We Love Tea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hester, Allison)
February 16, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Maureen Hester on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Allison Maureen Hester added to party Legacy HTLK, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Maureen Hester added to party T and Tea, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Maureen Hester added to party We Love Tea, LLC(pty:dft) (Hester, Allison)
February 16, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Warren Mark on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Joseph Warren Mark added to party Legacy HTLK, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Warren Mark added to party T and Tea, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Warren Mark added to party We Love Tea, LLC(pty:dft) (Mark, Joseph)
February 14, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Molly K. Reinhardt by Molly Kirsten Reinhardt on behalf of TeaHee LLCAttorney Molly Kirsten Reinhardt added to party TeaHee LLC(pty:pla) (Reinhardt, Molly)
February 14, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Christine E. Breen by Christine E. Breen on behalf of TeaHee LLCAttorney Christine E. Breen added to party TeaHee LLC(pty:pla) (Breen, Christine)
February 14, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Shirin Chahal by Shirin Chahal on behalf of TeaHee LLCAttorney Shirin Chahal added to party TeaHee LLC(pty:pla) (Chahal, Shirin)
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC (Bernstein, Howard)
February 13, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service in T and Tea, LLC dba TeaHee Boba Lakewood on 02.08.2024 by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Bernstein, Howard)
February 9, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service on We Love Tea on 02.06.2024 by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Bernstein, Howard)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Non-Service on We Love Tea, LLC dba TeaHee Boba Littleton on Feb. 4, 2024 by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Bernstein, Howard)
February 9, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Legacy HTLK dba Tea-Hee Boba and TeaHee Boba Thornton on 02.02.2024 by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Bernstein, Howard)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 3/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/1/2024. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/26/024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/13/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/26/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (blaws)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Bernstein, Howard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to We Love Tea, LLC; T and Tea, LLC; Legacy HTLK, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons We Love Tea, LLC, #2 Summons T and Tea, LLC, #3 Summons Legacy HTLK, Inc., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernstein, Howard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Certificate of Compliance re: Consultation on Motion filed by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Bernstein, Howard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Certificate of Compliance re: Consultation on Motion by Plaintiff TeaHee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Bernstein, Howard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number BCODC-9504071)Attorney Howard Owen Bernstein added to party TeaHee LLC(pty:pla), filed by TeaHee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Verification)(Bernstein, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TeaHee LLC v. We Love Tea, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TeaHee LLC
Represented By: Howard Owen Bernstein
Represented By: Christine E. Breen
Represented By: Molly Kirsten Reinhardt
Represented By: Shirin Chahal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Love Tea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and Tea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Love Tea, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as TeaHee Boba Littleton
Represented By: Allison Maureen Hester
Represented By: Joseph Warren Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and Tea, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as TeaHee Boba Lakewood
Represented By: Allison Maureen Hester
Represented By: Joseph Warren Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy HTLK, Inc. a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Tea-Hee Boba doing business as TeaHee Boba Thornton
Represented By: Allison Maureen Hester
Represented By: Joseph Warren Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?