Avodah Farms et al v. O'Hara-Rusckowski et al
Plaintiff: Avodah Farms and Keenan Fitzpatrick
Defendant: Deborah (I) O'Hara-Rusckowski, Deborah O'Hara-Rusckowski, Order of Malta, Western Association, USA, Order of Malta Worldwide Relief Malteser International Americas, Inc. and Order of Malta, American Association, U.S.A.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00233
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 t - Diversity: Torts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 24 DISREGARD - ENTERED INTO THE INCORRECT CASE CERTIFICATE of Service by USPS by Clerk of Court re 23 Minute Order, to Demontray Ward #45499-379 FLORENCE HIGH U.S. PENITENTIARY Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 7000 FLORENCE, CO 81226. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) Modified on 3/22/2024 (norlin, ).
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: The #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Order of Malta, Western Association, U.S.A. is a self-effectuating notice of dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiff's claims against this Defendant were dismissed without prejudice as of the filing of the Notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Order of Malta, Western Association, U.S.A. from this case. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/18/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Avodah Farms, Keenan Fitzpatrick. Order of Malta, American Association, U.S.A. waiver sent on 2/27/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Meyer, Michael)
March 15, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Avodah Farms, Keenan Fitzpatrick. Deborah (I) O'Hara-Rusckowski(individually) waiver sent on 2/23/2024, answer due 4/23/2024; Deborah O'Hara-Rusckowski(in a representative capacity for a Delware limited liability company) waiver sent on 2/23/2024, answer due 4/23/2024. (Meyer, Michael)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2024 at 10:00 AM is reset, TIME CHANGE ONLY, to 4/9/2024 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/15/2024. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
March 14, 2024 Filing 19 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES :re: #18 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by attorney Emilie C. Lorden. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
March 13, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ORDER OF MALTA, WESTERN ASSOCIATION, U.S.A. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Plaintiffs Avodah Farms, Keenan Fitzpatrick (Lorden, Emilie)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: At the Parties' request, the Court vacates the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for March 19, 2024 and resets it for April 9, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 4/2/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/2/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/12/2024. (jtorr, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Doherty, Peter)
February 29, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter H. Doherty on behalf of Order of Malta, American Association, U.S.A.Attorney Peter H. Doherty added to party Order of Malta, American Association, U.S.A.(pty:dft) (Doherty, Peter)
February 22, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Without Prejudice Of Defendant Order Of Malta Worldwide Relief Malteser International Americas, Inc. Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(A)(I) by Plaintiffs Avodah Farms, Keenan Fitzpatrick (Royval, Adam)
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE Complaint - Redacted Per DOC#12 Minute Order by Plaintiffs Avodah Farms, Keenan Fitzpatrick (Meyer, Michael)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: The #11 Unopposed Motion for Level 1 Restriction of D.E. 1 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain Level 1 Restriction over [Doc. 1] absent further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before 2/14/2024, Plaintiffs shall file a clean copy of the redacted version of their Complaint [Doc. 11-1] as a separate docket entry (i.e., as the main document in the filing). By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/09/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs Avodah Farms, Keenan Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Royval, Adam)
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Meyer, Michael)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/25/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/12/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emilie C. Lorden on behalf of Avodah Farms, Keenan FitzpatrickAttorney Emilie C. Lorden added to party Avodah Farms(pty:pla), Attorney Emilie C. Lorden added to party Keenan Fitzpatrick(pty:pla) (Lorden, Emilie)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: For purposes of clarity, the Court notes that Plaintiff Avodah Farms filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement on on January 25, 2024. See [Doc. 1-2]. However, the Disclosure Statement fails to meet the requirements of Rule 7.1(a)(2) because it does not "identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). Furthermore, it does not identify Plaintiff Keenan Fitzpatrick's state of citizenship. Thus, Plaintiff Avodah Farms's Corporate Disclosure Statement does not obviate the Court's February 1, 2024 deadline for Plaintiffs to each file compliant disclosure statements. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/25/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff filed this case pursuant to the Court's diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. See [Doc. 1]. Under Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement. The statement must name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). This disclosure statement is to be filed "when the action is filed in... federal court," Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2)(A), or at the time of the party's "first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their Rule 7.1 disclosure statements on or before 2/1/2024. In addition, it is ORDERED that each Defendant shall file their Rule 7.1 disclosure statement within seven days of that Party's first appearance in this case. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/25/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/25/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (efoga, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint,, filed by attorney M. Caleb Meyer. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEBORAH OHARA-RUSCKOWSKI, ORDER OF MALTA WORLDWIDE RELIEF MALTESER INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC, ORDER OF MALTA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION, U.S.A, ORDER OF MALTA, WESTERN ASSOCIATION (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9504578)Attorney Michael Caleb Meyer added to party AVODAH FARMS(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Caleb Meyer added to party KEENAN FITZPATRICK(pty:pla), filed by AVODAH FARMS, KEENAN FITZPATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Meyer, Michael) Modified on 2/2/2024 to set security at the request of chamber prior to #11 Motion to Restrict being ruled on(norlin, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avodah Farms et al v. O'Hara-Rusckowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avodah Farms
Represented By: Emilie C. Lorden
Represented By: Michael Caleb Meyer
Represented By: Adam M. Royval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Emilie C. Lorden
Represented By: Michael Caleb Meyer
Represented By: Adam M. Royval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah (I) O'Hara-Rusckowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah O'Hara-Rusckowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Order of Malta, Western Association, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Order of Malta Worldwide Relief Malteser International Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Order of Malta, American Association, U.S.A.
Represented By: Peter H. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?