Trifiletti v. Egg Strategy, Inc.
Plaintiff: David A Trifiletti
Defendant: Egg Strategy and Egg Strategy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00250
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Egg Strategy, Inc.. (Jordaan, Ashley)
March 8, 2024 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition to #15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff David A Trifiletti. (Tantalo, Joel)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Partial Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #18 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #15 ) on or before March 8, 2024. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/21/2024.(ccuen, )
February 20, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) to March 8, 2024 by Plaintiff David A Trifiletti. (Tantalo, Joel)
February 20, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joel Michael Tantalo on behalf of David A TrifilettiAttorney Joel Michael Tantalo added to party David A Trifiletti(pty:pla) (Tantalo, Joel)
February 2, 2024 Filing 16 State Court Complaint against Egg Strategy, Inc., filed by David A Trifiletti.(norlin, ) Modified on 2/6/2024 to correct formatting (norlin, ).
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Egg Strategy, Inc.. (Jordaan, Ashley)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Egg Strategy, Inc..(Jordaan, Ashley)
January 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE re 9 Administrative Notice, by Defendant Egg Strategy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Delay Reduction Order, #4 Exhibit D-State Court Pre-Trial Order and Discovery Protocol, #5 Exhibit E-State Court Summons for Defendant, #6 Exhibit F-State Court Webex Procedures, #7 Exhibit G-State Court Affidavit of Service)(Jordaan, Ashley)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM On or before April 11, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #11 ), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: April 25, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# at the scheduled time. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/29/2024. [order mailed to counsel as directed] (norlin, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
January 26, 2024 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
January 26, 2024 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs.See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
January 26, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Egg Strategy Inc. on 12/27/2023. (blaws)
January 26, 2024 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Egg Strategy, Inc., filed by David A Trifiletti. (blaws)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
January 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Keith K. Ybanez on behalf of Egg StrategyAttorney Keith K. Ybanez added to party Egg Strategy(pty:dft) (Ybanez, Keith)
January 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Egg Strategy (Jordaan, Ashley)
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Warren Jordaan on behalf of Egg Strategy (Jordaan, Ashley)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jordaan, Ashley)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Egg Strategy from District Court City & County of Denver, CO, Case Number 3CV33706. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9508645), filed by Egg Strategy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Removal)(Jordaan, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trifiletti v. Egg Strategy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Trifiletti
Represented By: Joel Michael Tantalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egg Strategy
Represented By: Keith K. Ybanez
Represented By: Ashley Warren Jordaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egg Strategy, Inc.
Represented By: Keith K. Ybanez
Represented By: Ashley Warren Jordaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?