Conner et al v. American Movers Direct LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dave Conner and Vicky Conner
Defendant: American Movers Direct LLC, Roger Cohen and Express Van Line
Case Number: 1:2024cv00276
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706 Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 March 2024. The Court grants Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and Extend Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines #22 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for April 3, 2024, is vacated and reset to May 9, 2024 at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.(cmadr, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Olson on behalf of Dave Conner, Vicky ConnerAttorney Anthony Joseph Olson added to party Dave Conner(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Joseph Olson added to party Vicky Conner(pty:pla) (Olson, Anthony)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 9 Minute Order, filed by Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/20/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 9 Minute Order, by Plaintiffs Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. (Chaney, Lelia)
March 18, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Movers Direct LLC.(Cooper, Jason)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: The #19 Defendant AMD's Motion to Dismiss Counts Two Through Four of Plaintiffs' Complaint is hereby STRICKEN for failure to comply with this Court's Practice Standards with respect to conferral. See NYW Civ. Practice Standard 7.1B(b) ("[P]arties are required to meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)."). Defendant AMD shall respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint and Jury Demand on or before March 18, 2024. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/15/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
March 14, 2024 Filing 19 STRICKEN - MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS TWO THROUGH FOUR OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Defendant American Movers Direct LLC. (Cooper, Jason) Modified on 3/15/2024 to reflect 20 Minute Order(norlin, ).
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Roger Cohen re #17 Second MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Roger Cohen Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a) as: the affidavit or declaration concerning defendant(s) military status required by Service Members Civil Relief Act was not filed per D.C.COLO.LCivR 55.1 (a)(1), by Clerk. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Roger Cohen Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a) by Plaintiffs Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. (Chaney, Lelia)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reza Darius Rismani on behalf of American Movers Direct LLCAttorney Reza Darius Rismani added to party American Movers Direct LLC(pty:dft) (Rismani, Reza)
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason David Cooper on behalf of American Movers Direct LLCAttorney Jason David Cooper added to party American Movers Direct LLC(pty:dft) (Cooper, Jason)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/12/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc5, )
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT. Default will not be entered as to Roger Cohen re #10 Motion for Entry of Default, as the affidavit or declaration concerning defendant's military status required by Service Members Civil Relief Act was not filed. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
March 11, 2024 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00276-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: I direct the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case. This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/11/2024. (jtorr, )
March 11, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Roger Cohen Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a) by Plaintiffs Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. (Chaney, Lelia)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 11:30 AM is reset, TIME CHANGE ONLY, to 4/3/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/7/2024. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant American Movers Direct LLC's "Unopposed Limited Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of Otherwise Respond to Complaint" for good cause shown. Defendant American Movers Direct LLC shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF #1 ) on or before March 14, 2024. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/22/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, Unopposed MOTION for Order to Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant American Movers Direct LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time)(Lico, Joseph)
February 14, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. Roger Cohen served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (Chaney, Lelia)
February 14, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. American Movers Direct LLC served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (Chaney, Lelia)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/30/2024. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 3/27/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/27/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against American Movers Direct LLC, Roger Cohen, Express Van Line (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9513256)Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Dave Conner(pty:pla), Attorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Vicky Conner(pty:pla), filed by Dave Conner, Vicky Conner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons American Movers Direct, #3 Summons Roger Cohen, #4 Summons Express Van Line)(Chaney, Lelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner et al v. American Movers Direct LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Conner
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Conner
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Movers Direct LLC
Represented By: Jason David Cooper
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Represented By: Reza Darius Rismani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Van Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?