Dennis Kirk Inc. v. Williepaul Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Kirk Inc.
Defendant: Williepaul Inc. doing business as Tires Official Shop
Case Number: 1:2024cv00288
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 23 Preliminary Injunction Receipt. (jrobe, )
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This order is hereby conditioned upon Plaintiff's filing with the Clerk of this Court an undertaking in the form of a bond, certified check, bank check, or cash in the amount of $5,000.00 no later than March 8, 2024, to secure the payment of such costs and damages not to exceed such sum as may be suffered or sustained by any party who is found to be wrongfully enjoined hereby. By Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/4/2024.(dgumb, )
March 2, 2024 Filing 21 Exhibits in Support of #18 Notice (Other) Exhibit B to Proposed Order by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Etienne, Mike)
March 2, 2024 Filing 20 Exhibits in Support of #18 Notice (Other) Exhibit A to Proposed Order by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Etienne, Mike)
February 29, 2024 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/29/2024. For the reasons set forth on the record, it is ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 is GRANTED. A separate order shall enter. Court Reporter: Sadie Herbert. (kmyha)
February 29, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc. (Etienne, Mike)
February 21, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Boylan, Kristine)
February 21, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,, #6 Summons Issued Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Boylan, Kristine)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. This matter is before the Court on #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 2/29/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Regina M. Rodriguez. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/20/2024. Text Only Entry (kmyha)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/9/2024. Text Only Entry (kmyha)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 Case drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter (Text Only Entry). (jrobe, )
February 8, 2024 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a). This case is randomly Judge Regina M. Rodriguez. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-00288-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
February 8, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Michael Etienne, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of W. Michael Etienne, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of W. Michael Etienne, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of W. Michael Etienne, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of W. Michael Etienne)(Fletcher, Ryan)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mike Michael Etienne on behalf of Dennis Kirk Inc.Attorney Mike Michael Etienne added to party Dennis Kirk Inc.(pty:pla) (Etienne, Mike)
February 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristine Marie Boylan on behalf of Dennis Kirk Inc.Attorney Kristine Marie Boylan added to party Dennis Kirk Inc.(pty:pla) (Boylan, Kristine)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM Plaintiff shall promptly serve Defendant. On or before April 4, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #6-1), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: April 18, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# at the scheduled time. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/31/2024. (norlin, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fletcher, Ryan)
January 31, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tgall, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc. (Fletcher, Ryan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to williepaul Inc. d/b/a/ Tires Official Shop re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Fletcher, Ryan)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against williepaul Inc. d/b/a Tires Official Shop (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9515545)Attorney Ryan James Fletcher added to party Dennis Kirk Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Dennis Kirk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to the Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to the Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to the Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 to the Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 to the Complaint, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fletcher, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis Kirk Inc. v. Williepaul Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kirk Inc.
Represented By: Ryan James Fletcher
Represented By: Kristine Marie Boylan
Represented By: Mike Michael Etienne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williepaul Inc. doing business as Tires Official Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?