Spice Merchants Entities Corp. et al v. Pretty Colorado, LLC et al
Counter Defendant: Spice Merchants Entities Corp., STM Properties, LLC and Lisa Freeman
Counter Claimant: Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine Winslow and Ellis Young (USA), Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00371
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #17 ). It is hereby ORDERED that the parties should be prepared to argue the subject motion at the Scheduling Conference set for May 28, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/5/2024. (ccuen, )
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pretty Colorado, LLC, Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Corine Winslow.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/5/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
April 4, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Corine Winslow, Pretty Colorado, LLC, Ellis Young (USA), Ltd..(Wesoky, Jason)
April 4, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine Winslow. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendants' Appendix to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Wesoky, Jason)
April 4, 2024 Filing 17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine Winslow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Appendix to Partial Motion for Dismissal)(Wesoky, Jason)
March 7, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Francis Nistico, III on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Joseph Francis Nistico, III added to party Ellis Young (USA), Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Francis Nistico, III added to party Pretty Colorado, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Francis Nistico, III added to party Corine Winslow(pty:dft) (Nistico, Joseph)
March 7, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Engram Weatherford Wilkinson on behalf of Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine WinslowAttorney Engram Weatherford Wilkinson added to party Ellis Young (USA), Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Engram Weatherford Wilkinson added to party Pretty Colorado, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Engram Weatherford Wilkinson added to party Corine Winslow(pty:dft) (Wilkinson, Engram)
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Amended by Jason Bryan Wesoky on behalf of Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine Winslow (Wesoky, Jason)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #11 ) is GRANTED. All Defendants are permitted to submit a response to the complaint and a response in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion on or before April 4, 2024. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/6/2024.(ccuen, )
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pretty Colorado, LLC, Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Corine Winslow. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/6/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine Winslow. (Wesoky, Jason)
March 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Nistico, Engram Wilson, and by Jason Bryan Wesoky on behalf of Ellis Young (USA), Ltd., Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine WinslowAttorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Ellis Young (USA), Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Pretty Colorado, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Corine Winslow(pty:dft) (Wesoky, Jason)
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiffs Lisa Freeman, STM Properties, LLC, Spice Merchants Entities Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Affidavit of Service - Corine Winslow, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Ellis Young)(Bruno, Harold)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Lisa Freeman, STM Properties, LLC, Spice Merchants Entities Corp.. (Bruno, Harold)
February 8, 2024 Filing 7 LETTER Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiffs Lisa Freeman, STM Properties, LLC, Spice Merchants Entities Corp.. (Bruno, Harold)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) shall be held on: May 28, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# at the scheduled time. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/8/2024. (norlin, )
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/8/2024. Text Only Entry (kmyha)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ellis Young (USA), LTD, Pretty Colorado, LLC, Corine Winslow, STM Properties, LLC (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9529582)Attorney Harold R. Bruno, III added to party Lisa Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney Harold R. Bruno, III added to party Spice Merchants Entities Corp.(pty:pla), filed by Spice Merchants Entities Corp., Lisa Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Pages Plaintiffs Spice Merchants Entities Corp and STM Properties, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1), #3 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #5 Summons Summons in a Civil Action)(Bruno, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spice Merchants Entities Corp. et al v. Pretty Colorado, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Spice Merchants Entities Corp.
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: STM Properties, LLC
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lisa Freeman
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Pretty Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Engram Weatherford Wilkinson
Represented By: Jason Bryan Wesoky
Represented By: Joseph Francis Nistico, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Corine Winslow
Represented By: Engram Weatherford Wilkinson
Represented By: Jason Bryan Wesoky
Represented By: Joseph Francis Nistico, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ellis Young (USA), Ltd.
Represented By: Engram Weatherford Wilkinson
Represented By: Jason Bryan Wesoky
Represented By: Joseph Francis Nistico, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?