Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd. v. CLMBR, Inc.
Petitioner: Tung Keng Enterprise Co., LTD d/b/a DK City Co., Ltd. and Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd. doing business as DK City Co., Ltd.
Respondent: CLMBR, Inc. and Interactive Strength Inc. doing business as Forme
Case Number: 1:2024cv00432
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0202 - Award Under Convention on Foreign Arbitral Awards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award by Respondent Interactive Strength Inc.. (LeBoeuf, Sterling)
March 29, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Eaton on behalf of Interactive Strength Inc.Attorney Nicholas Andrew Eaton added to party Interactive Strength Inc.(pty:res) (Eaton, Nicholas)
March 29, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sterling J. LeBoeuf on behalf of Interactive Strength Inc.Attorney Sterling J. LeBoeuf added to party Interactive Strength Inc.(pty:res) (LeBoeuf, Sterling)
March 18, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.. CLMBR, Inc. served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Bernal, Patrick)
March 13, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.. Interactive Strength Inc. served on 3/13/2024, answer due 4/3/2024. (Bernal, Patrick)
March 11, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Interactive Strength Inc. d/b/a FORME re #12 Petition/Application by Petitioner Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.. (Bernal, Patrick)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD, filed by Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.. (Petition filed per [#11] Order). (sphil, )
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw #1 Petition/Application and to File Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. The Petition at ECF No. #1 is deemed withdrawn. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to docket the First Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award located at ECF No. 10-2. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 3/7/2024. Text Only Entry(cnsja. )
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Petition/Application, and File Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award by Petitioner Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Athenour, Daniel)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, )
February 21, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to CLMBR, Inc. re #1 Petition/Application, by Petitioner Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.. (Bernal, Patrick)
February 14, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Houston Athenour on behalf of Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.Attorney Daniel Houston Athenour added to party Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.(pty:pet) (Athenour, Daniel)
February 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aja Rose Robbins on behalf of Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.Attorney Aja Rose Robbins added to party Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd.(pty:pet) (Robbins, Aja)
February 14, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
February 13, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
February 13, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tung Sheng Global Co. LTD for Tung Keng Enterprise Co., LTD d/b/a DK City Co., Ltd.. (Bernal, Patrick)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to CLMBR, Inc. re #1 Petition/Application, by Petitioner Tung Keng Enterprise Co., LTD d/b/a DK City Co., Ltd.. (Bernal, Patrick)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9539877)Attorney Patrick J. Bernal added to party Tung Keng Enterprise Co., LTD d/b/a DK City Co., Ltd.(pty:pet), filed by Tung Keng Enterprise Co., LTD d/b/a DK City Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - OEM Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Final Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Case Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernal, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd. v. CLMBR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tung Keng Enterprise Co., LTD d/b/a DK City Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tung Keng Enterprise Co., Ltd. doing business as DK City Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Aja Rose Robbins
Represented By: Daniel Houston Athenour
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CLMBR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Interactive Strength Inc. doing business as Forme
Represented By: Nicholas Andrew Eaton
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?