Subkoff v. Western Union Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Subkoff
Defendant: Western Union Company, The and Western Union Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00530
Filed: February 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To Section 3 Of The Federal Arbitration Act by Defendant Western Union Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Dosch, Joseph)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER striking #16 Motion to Stay. The motion is stricken for exceeding the page limitations set forth in the Court's Uniform Civil Practice Standards (Civ. Practice Standard 10.1(c)). So Ordered by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 4/23/2024. Text Only Entry(schap, )
April 22, 2024 Filing 16 STRICKEN MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To Section 3 Of The Federal Arbitration Act by Defendant Western Union Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Dosch, Joseph) Modified on 4/23/2024 to strike pursuant to 17 Order (schap, ).
April 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas W. Katz on behalf of Western Union Company, The, Western Union Financial Services, Inc.Attorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party Western Union Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party Western Union Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Katz, Nicholas)
April 22, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Christopher McAdam on behalf of Western Union Company, The, Western Union Financial Services, Inc.Attorney Kevin Christopher McAdam added to party Western Union Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Christopher McAdam added to party Western Union Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (McAdam, Kevin)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 9 April 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/23/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 4/9/2024. Text Only Entry (schap, )
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 9 April 2024. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent/Non-Consent Form #9 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future filings shall be designated: 24-cv-00530-GPG. (cmadr, )
April 3, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert A. Waller, Jr on behalf of Daniel SubkoffAttorney Robert A. Waller, Jr added to party Daniel Subkoff(pty:pla) (Waller, Robert)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Western Union Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Sheppard, Hille)
March 22, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (Joint) by Defendants Western Union Financial Services, Inc., Western Union Company, The. Western Union Financial Services, Inc. answer due 4/22/2024; Western Union Company, The answer due 4/22/2024. (Sheppard, Hille)
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Western Union Company, The, Western Union Financial Services, Inc.. (Sheppard, Hille)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Ryan Dosch on behalf of Western Union Company, The, Western Union Financial Services, Inc.Attorney Joseph Ryan Dosch added to party Western Union Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Ryan Dosch added to party Western Union Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dosch, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard on behalf of Western Union Company, The, Western Union Financial Services, Inc.Attorney Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard added to party Western Union Company, The(pty:dft), Attorney Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard added to party Western Union Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Sheppard, Hille)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Robert Radulescu. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
February 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Union Company, The, Western Union Financial Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9557016)Attorney Robert Radulescu added to party Daniel Subkoff(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Subkoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Radulescu, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subkoff v. Western Union Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Subkoff
Represented By: Robert Radulescu
Represented By: Robert A. Waller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Union Company, The
Represented By: Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Dosch
Represented By: Kevin Christopher McAdam
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Union Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Dosch
Represented By: Kevin Christopher McAdam
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?