Sorell v. Secura Supreme Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Reagan Sorell
Defendant: Secura Supreme Insurance Company and Secura Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00599
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Party; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 20 Report and Recommendations, pursuant to 28 Order. Entered by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/15/2024. Text Only Entry(kmyha)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/15/2024. Join Parties due 5/31/2024. Designation of Affirmative Experts due 9/13/2024. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 10/11/2024. Discovery due by 11/29/2024. (trvo, )
April 15, 2024 Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/15/2024. FTR: C205. (trvo, )
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 20 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. No party has objected to the Recommendation. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS 20 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The #12 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party Defendant Secura Insurance Company without Prejudice is GRANTED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (voluntary dismissal) or 21 (permitting the court on motion or sua sponte to drop a party). See Casady v. Cherry Creek Sch. Dist. Bd. of Educ., No. 21-cv-02542-CMA-NYW, 2022 WL 3109569, at *2 (D. Colo. June 15, 2022), report and recommendation adopted, 2022 WL 3099144 (D. Colo. Aug. 4, 2022) (noting uncertainty in the Tenth Circuit concerning which rule applies when a plaintiff voluntarily dismisses one of multiple defendants). By Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/15/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrlc4, ) . (Entered: 04/15/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Reagan Sorell. (Breuer, Jessica)
April 2, 2024 Filing 24 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Secura Supreme Insurance Company.(Hertzke, Billy-George)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3/29/2024, granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Secura Supreme Insurance Company answer due 4/2/2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Secura Supreme Insurance Company.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/29/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
March 29, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Secura Supreme Insurance Company. (Ross, Kathrina)
March 28, 2024 Filing 20 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3/28/2024 that the #12 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Secura Insurance Company without Prejudice be granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (voluntary dismissal) or 21 (permitting the court on motion or sua sponte to drop a party). See Casady v. Cherry Creek Sch. Dist. Bd. of Educ., No. 21-cv-02542-CMA-NYW, 2022 WL 3109569, at *2 (D. Colo. June 15, 2022), report and recommendation adopted, 2022 WL 3099144 (D. Colo. Aug. 4, 2022) (noting uncertainty in the Tenth Circuit concerning which rule applies when a plaintiff voluntarily dismisses one of multiple defendants). Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
March 27, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathrina Rae Murphy Ross on behalf of Secura Supreme Insurance CompanyAttorney Kathrina Rae Murphy Ross added to party Secura Supreme Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ross, Kathrina)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Secura Insurance Company without Prejudice filed by Secura Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/27/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 3/27/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00599-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Reagan Sorell All parties do not consent.. (Breuer, Jessica)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3/26/2024. On the parties' request due to a calendar conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2024 is VACATED and RESET to 4/15/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/8/2024. The deadline to file consent/non-consent (ECF No. 7) to magistrate judge jurisdiction remains 3/27/2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
March 25, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica L. Breuer on behalf of Reagan SorellAttorney Jessica L. Breuer added to party Reagan Sorell(pty:pla) (Breuer, Jessica)
March 18, 2024 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Secura Insurance Company without Prejudice by Defendant Secura Insurance Company. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3/14/2024, GRANTING the #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Secura Insurance Company and Secura Supreme Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the #3 Complaint on or before 3/29/2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc3)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Secura Supreme Insurance Company. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3/11/2024. Consent Form due by 3/27/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/3/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2024, at 10:00 AM MDT in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (trvo, )
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dustin Priebe on behalf of Reagan SorellAttorney Dustin Priebe added to party Reagan Sorell(pty:pla) (Priebe, Dustin)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
March 5, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVITS of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Secura Supreme Insurance Company, Secura Insurance Company on 02/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 in re Secura Insurance Company) (blaws)
March 5, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVITS of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Secura Supreme Insurance Company, Secura Insurance Company on 02/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 in re Secura Insurance Company) (blaws)
March 5, 2024 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Secura Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, filed by Reagan Sorell. (blaws)
March 5, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
March 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Secura Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company from District Court, Douglas County, Case Number 2024CV30132. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9571690), filed by Secura Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Summons (SECURA Supreme), #4 Exhibit D - Civil Summons (SECURA Insurance), #5 Exhibit E - Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit F - Return of Service (SECURA Supreme 2.13), #7 Exhibit G - Return of Service (SECURA 2.13), #8 Exhibit H - Return of Service (SECURA Supreme 2.19), #9 Exhibit I - Return of Service (SECURA 2.19), #10 Exhibit J - Voting Record, #11 Exhibit K - Property Record, #12 Exhibit L - NAIC, #13 Exhibit M - NAIC, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #16 State Court Pleading Index, #17 Certification that "Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal" was Filed with State Court, #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hertzke, Billy-George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorell v. Secura Supreme Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reagan Sorell
Represented By: Dustin Priebe
Represented By: Jessica L. Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Supreme Insurance Company
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Represented By: Kathrina Rae Murphy Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Insurance Company
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?