Town of Superior et al v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The et al
Plaintiff: TOWN OF SUPERIOR, COLORADO, THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF BOULDER, COLORADO, Town of Superior and Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The
Defendant: THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF JEFFERSON, COLORADO, DR. STEPHANIE CORBO, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The and Stephanie Corbo
Case Number: 1:2024cv00711
Filed: March 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 47101 - Airport & Airway Improvement Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Town of Superior. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barr, Andrew)
April 30, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The, Stephanie Corbo. (Goldberg, Milton)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Town of Superior. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/11/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc9, )
April 11, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Town of Superior. (Barr, Andrew)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may submit a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss any time on or before May 3, 2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/5/2024. Text Only Entry(dddlc9, )
April 4, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 4/4/2024. before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak: Defendants Oral Motion to Stay is GRANTED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss and forthcoming Motion to Remand. In the event the Motion to Dismiss is denied, the parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Varholaks chambers within 7 days of such decision to set a schedulingconference. FTR: A402. (msmot, )
April 4, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Town of Superior. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Barr, Andrew)
March 29, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The, Stephanie Corbo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss - Declaration of M. Roy Goldberg, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration - FAA Leaded Aviation Fuel and the Environment, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration - EAGLE White Paper on the EPA's Finding on Lead Emissions Decision, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration - EAGLE Stakeholder Q A on the EPA's Endangerment Finding on Lead Emissions Decisions, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Goldberg, Milton)
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Defendants Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The, Stephanie Corbo (Goldberg, Milton)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of the Docket. A Status Conference is set for 4/4/2024 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/20/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
March 20, 2024 Filing 14 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE pursuant to ECF 13 . Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak added to the case. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00711-DDD-STV.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.1(a) and the approval of the Chief Judge, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak as the referral judge. All future pleadings should be designated 1:24-cv-00711-DDD-STV. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/20/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
March 19, 2024 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The, Stephanie Corbo All parties do not consent.. (Goldberg, Milton)
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lindsay N. Aherne on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The, Town of SuperiorAttorney Lindsay N. Aherne added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The(pty:pla), Attorney Lindsay N. Aherne added to party Town of Superior(pty:pla) (Aherne, Lindsay)
March 18, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John A. Wharton on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The, Town of SuperiorAttorney John A. Wharton added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The(pty:pla), Attorney John A. Wharton added to party Town of Superior(pty:pla) (Wharton, John)
March 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Daniel Barr on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The, Town of SuperiorAttorney Andrew Daniel Barr added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Daniel Barr added to party Town of Superior(pty:pla) (Barr, Andrew)
March 15, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Updated State Court Register of Actions by Defendants Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The, Stephanie Corbo (Attachments: #1 State Court Return of Service - Dr. Stephanie Corbo, #2 State Court Return of Service - Jefferson County)(Vasquez, Nathaniel)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/15/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
March 14, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (blaws)
March 14, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The, Stephanie Corbo, filed by Town of Superior, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The. (blaws)
March 14, 2024 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
March 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Nathaniel T. Vasquez on behalf of DR. STEPHANIE CORBO, THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF JEFFERSON, COLORADO (Vasquez, Nathaniel)
March 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DR. STEPHANIE CORBO, THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF JEFFERSON, COLORADO , Based on Federal Question Jurisdiction, from District Court, Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2024CV30221. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9589070), filed by DR. STEPHANIE CORBO, THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF JEFFERSON, COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal - State Court Summons - Jefferson County, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal - State Court Summons Summons - Dr. Stephanie Corbo, #4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal - State Court Notice of Related Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 to Notice of Removal - Pending State Court Filing - Notice of Entry of Appearance - Nathaniel T. Vasquez, #7 Exhibit 7 to Notice of Removal - State Court Register of Actions, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldberg, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Superior et al v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWN OF SUPERIOR, COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF BOULDER, COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Superior
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Lindsay N. Aherne
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Boulder, Colorado, The
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Barr
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Lindsay N. Aherne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF JEFFERSON, COLORADO
Represented By: Nathaniel T. Vasquez
Represented By: Milton Roy Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. STEPHANIE CORBO
Represented By: Nathaniel T. Vasquez
Represented By: Milton Roy Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado, The
Represented By: Nathaniel T. Vasquez
Represented By: Milton Roy Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Corbo
Represented By: Nathaniel T. Vasquez
Represented By: Milton Roy Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?