Reynolds v. FTE Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Reynolds
Defendant: FTE Networks, Inc., US Home Rentals, LLC, Vision Property Management, LLC, VPM Holdings LLC, ACM Vision V, LLC, Michael Beys and Richard de Silva
Case Number: 1:2024cv00916
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Cathy Reynolds. (Osborne, Matthew)
May 24, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Cathy Reynolds. (Osborne, Matthew)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered: Plaintiff shall have an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Richard de Silvas Motion to Dismiss and said extension shall be to May 30, 2024. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on May 15, 2024. Text Only Entry(gpglc3)
May 15, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cathy Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Osborne, Matthew)
May 10, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Michael Beys, FTE Networks, Inc., US Home Rentals, LLC, Richard de Silva. (Segura, Brandi)
May 1, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #15 Response, #9 Notice (Other), REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Defendants Michael Beys, FTE Networks, Inc.. (Segura, Brandi)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have a 14-day extension of time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss, making the new deadline May 16, 2024. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on May 1, 2024. Text Only Entry(gpglc3)
May 1, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cathy Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Osborne, Matthew)
April 30, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Cathy Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit of service (Beys), #2 Exhibit 2 - affidavit of service (FTE), #3 Exhibit 3 - order of default (Beys), #4 Exhibit 4 - order of default (FTE), #5 Exhibit 5 - motion for default judgment, #6 Exhibit 6 - motion to set aside default, #7 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Osborne, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #9 Notice (Other), by Plaintiff Cathy ReynoldsAttorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Cathy Reynolds(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit of service (Beys), #2 Exhibit 2 - affidavit of service (FTE), #3 Exhibit 3 - order of default (Beys), #4 Exhibit 4 - order of default (FTE), #5 Exhibit 5 - declaration of Beys)(Osborne, Matthew)
April 11, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Richard de Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss)(Segura, Brandi)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/3/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/10/2024. (evaug )
April 9, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Lateral Investment Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Lateral FTE Feeder, LLC, Other Affiliate Lateral U.S. Credit Opportunities Fund, L.P., Other Affiliate Niagara Nominee, LP, Other Affiliate Lateral Credit Opportunities, LLC, Other Affiliate Dhamitha Richard de Silva, Other Affiliate Patrick Feeney for FTE Networks, Inc.. (Segura, Brandi)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants FTE Networks, Inc., De Silva, and Beys removed this case to federal court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). See ECF #1 . Under Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement. The statement must name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). This disclosure statement is to be filed "when the action is filed in... federal court," Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2)(A), or at the time of the party's "first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before April 16, 2024, Defendant's FTE, De Silva, and Beys shall file a Rule 7.1 disclosure statement, and within seven days of Plaintiff's and the remaining Defendants' appearance in this matter, each shall file a Rule 7.1 disclosure statement. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/19/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brandi M. Segura on behalf of Michael Beys, FTE Networks, Inc., US Home Rentals, LLC, Richard de SilvaAttorney Brandi M. Segura added to party US Home Rentals, LLC(pty:dft) (Segura, Brandi)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Pending State Court Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default by Defendants Michael Beys, FTE Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Declaration of Michael Beys in support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Propose Order for Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)(Segura, Brandi)
April 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Pending State Court Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants FTE Networks, Inc. and Michael Beys Filed by Plaintiff by Defendants Michael Beys, FTE Networks, Inc., Richard de Silva (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to State Court Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants FTE Networks, Inc. and Michael Beys Filed by Plaintiff)(Segura, Brandi)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 4/5/2024. Text Only Entry (schap, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, or Third Party Complaint and Jury Demand upon Michael Beys on 12/22/2023, and FTE Networks, Inc. on 12/23/2023. (tgall, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ACM Vision V, LLC, Michael Beys, FTE Networks, Inc., US Home Rentals, LLC, VPM Holdings LLC, Vision Property Management, LLC, Richard de Silva, filed by Cathy Reynolds.(tgall, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FTE Networks, Inc., Richard de Silva, Michael Beys from District Court, Pueblo County, Colorado, Case Number 2023CV030683. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9623528), filed by FTE Networks, Inc., Richard de Silva, Michael Beys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Complaint in State Action, #2 Exhibit Ex B Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit Ex C Court Orders, #4 Exhibit Ex D Register of Actions in State Case, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Supplement)(Segura, Brandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. FTE Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Reynolds
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTE Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Brandi M. Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Home Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Brandi M. Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VPM Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACM Vision V, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beys
Represented By: Brandi M. Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard de Silva
Represented By: Brandi M. Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?