Ptselnikov v. Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Aida Ptselnikov
Defendant: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv01030
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/11/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc7).
May 30, 2024 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge All parties do not consent. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01030-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
May 30, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company All parties do not consent.. (Powers, Brendan)
April 18, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance of Jordan Willison, Esq. by Jordan M. Willison on behalf of Aida PtselnikovAttorney Jordan M. Willison added to party Aida Ptselnikov(pty:pla) (Willison, Jordan)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTINGDEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM On or before June 26, 2024, the parties shallcomplete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #8), indicating eitherunanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please notethat this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated byD.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant toFed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: July 10, 2024 at 11:00 a.m.in Courtroom A-401,Fourth Floor,Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse,901 19th Street,Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutesprior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference lineas a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#.If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should conferwith opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to amore convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for reschedulingany appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less thanFIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/18/2024. (norlin, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint with Jury Demand, and Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company on 3/27/2024 (efoga, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company, filed by Aida Ptselnikov.(efoga, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Powers, Brendan)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company.(Powers, Brendan)
April 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2024-CV-31002. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9642089), filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Police Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Preliminary Record Affidavit of Service, #6 Preliminary Record Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Preliminary Record Complaint, #8 Preliminary Record Summons, #9 Preliminary Record Delay Reduction Order)(Powers, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ptselnikov v. Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Ptselnikov
Represented By: Jordan M. Willison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By: Brendan O'Rourke Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?