Davis (PS) v. City of Aurora et al
Plaintiff: Lewis Davis, Jr.
Defendant: City of Aurora, Brandon Vickrey, David Waller and Tony Cancino
Case Number: 1:2024cv01081
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard Thomas Gurley
Referring Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 8 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Upon his appointment and with the permission of Chief Judge Brimmer pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), this action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Gurley at the end of the case number (such as 24-cv-01081-RTG). (Text only entry). (efoga, )
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. By Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/22/2024.(schap, )
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tony Cancino, City of Aurora, Brandon Vickrey, David Waller, filed by Lewis Davis, Jr.(schap, )
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. Plaintiff cure the deficiency designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/22/2024. (ccuen, )
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tony Cancino, City of Aurora, Brandon Vickrey, David Waller, filed by Lewis Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (blaws)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiff Lewis Davis, Jr. (blaws)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Cancino, City of Aurora, Brandon Vickrey, David Waller, filed by Lewis Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (blaws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis (PS) v. City of Aurora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Cancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?