Ajigbotafe v. Walton
Plaintiff: Olufemi Ajigbotafe
Defendant: Harmony Walton
Case Number: 1:2024cv01151
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #22 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Mailed to Harmony Walton 2024 Meadowlark Ranch Ln San Marcos, CA 92078 (dgumb, )
June 13, 2024 Filing 22 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Thus, the Court respectfully recommends that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF #10 ] be granted and this case be dismissed without prejudice. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/2024. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2024 (dgumb, )
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Harmony Walton. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 6/13/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 6/13/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
June 13, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #17 Minute Order, 18 Case Reassigned. Mailed to Harmony Walton 2024 Meadowlark Ranch Ln San Marcos, CA 92078 (dgumb, )
June 13, 2024 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-1151-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: This case has been directly assigned to me pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. The Parties' deadline to complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form is July 1, 2024. ECF #4 . Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss. ECF #10 . However, I may only enter an Order on the pending Motion if the Parties unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.2; 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Because the Parties have not yet indicated whether they consent to such jurisdiction, I am unable to proceed. Accordingly, I direct the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case. This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/2024. (dgumb, )
June 10, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #15 Response to Order to Show Cause. Mailed to Harmony Walton 2024 Meadowlark Ranch Ln San Marcos, CA 92078 (dgumb, )
June 10, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO #8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Olufemi Ajigbotafe. (dgumb, )
June 4, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #13 Minute Order. Mailed to Harmony Walton 2024 Meadowlark Ranch Ln San Marcos, CA 92078 and Olufemi Ajigbotafe 391 Mira Loma Lane Escondido, CA 92025 (dgumb, )
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court are four recent filings by Defendant Harmony Walton. ECFs #6 - #7 , #10 - #11 . The documents at ECFs #6 and #7 were filed on May 29, 2024. Those at ECFs #10 and #11 were filed on June 3, 2024 and seem to be duplicates of ECFs #6 and #7 . Compare ECFs #6 and #7 with ECFs #10 and #11 . ECFs #6 and #10 are both titled "Defendant Harmony Walton's Motion to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(1): Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction." The two Motions seem to be identical, except that ECF #10 lacks the Certificate of Service attachment. Accordingly, the Court finds moot the earlier-filed Motion at ECF #6 . ECFs #7 and #11 are both titled "Defendant Harmony Walton's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(1): Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction." Again, the two Requests seem to be identical, except that ECF #11 lacks the Certificate of Service attachment. Compare ECF #7 with ECF #11 . Accordingly, the Court finds moot the earlier-filed Request at ECF #7 . Further, to the extent that ECF #11 asks the Court to take judicial notice of filings from the related case in the Superior Court of California in ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF #10 ], the Court will consider such a request at the same time it addresses that Motion. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/4/2024.(dgumb, )
June 3, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #11 Defendant Harmony Walton's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(B)(1): Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Mailed to Harmony Walton 2024 Meadowlark Ranch Ln San Marcos, CA 92078 and Olufemi Ajigbotafe 391 Mira Loma Lane Escondido, CA 92025 (dgumb, )
June 3, 2024 Filing 11 Defendant Harmony Walton's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(B)(1): Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Harmony Walton. (dgumb, )
June 3, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant Harmony Walton's MOTION to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(B)(1): Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Harmony Walton. (dgumb, )
May 31, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #8 Order to Show Cause. Mailed to Harmony Walton 2024 Meadowlark Ranch Ln San Marcos, CA 92078 and Olufemi Ajigbotafe 391 Mira Loma Lane Escondido, CA 92025 (dgumb, )
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before June 11, 2024 explaining why this case should not be dismissed for the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Specifically, Plaintiff should provide evidence of the residency of each of the Parties if Plaintiff is asserting diversity jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/31/2024. (dgumb, )
May 29, 2024 Filing 7 Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(B)(1): Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Harmony Walton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jrobe, )
May 29, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Fed Rule Civil Procedure 12(B)(1): Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Harmony Walton (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jrobe, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #4 Minute Order. Mailed to Olufemi Ajigbotafe 391 Mira Loma Lane Escondido, CA 92025 (dgumb, )
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Consent Form due 7/1/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/1/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2024 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/26/2024. (dgumb, )
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harmony Walton (Filing Fee: $405.00, Receipt Number: 110407), filed by Olufemi Ajigbotafe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Statement, #3 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 District Court Civil Summons) (blaws) Modified on 4/25/2024 to attach additional received documents. (blaws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajigbotafe v. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olufemi Ajigbotafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?