Schutt v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Schutt
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC, d/b/a King Soopers and Dillon Companies, LLC a Kansas limited liability company doing business as King Soopers
Case Number: 1:2024cv01171
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 20 May 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/8/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 STATEMENT of Citizenship by Plaintiff Daniel Schutt. (Crowther, Matthew)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 6 May 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than May 13, 2024, Plaintiff shall file his Rule 7.1(a) disclosure statements. (cmadr, )
April 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Allan Crowther on behalf of Daniel SchuttAttorney Matthew Allan Crowther added to party Daniel Schutt(pty:pla) (Crowther, Matthew)
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND to #5 Complaint by Dillon Companies, LLC.(efoga, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint, Complaint and Jury Demand, and District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim or Third Party Complaint and Jury Demand upon Dillon Companies LLC on 3/29/2024 (efoga, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Dillon Companies, LLC, filed by Daniel Schutt.(efoga, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katie Berit Johnson on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC, d/b/a King SoopersAttorney Katie Berit Johnson added to party Dillon Companies, LLC, d/b/a King Soopers(pty:dft) (Johnson, Katie)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Beschastna, Tetyana)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dillon Companies, LLC, d/b/a King Soopers from Broomfield County District Court, Case Number 2024CV030105. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9659297), filed by Dillon Companies, LLC, d/b/a King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Beschastna, Tetyana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schutt v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schutt
Represented By: Matthew Allan Crowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC, d/b/a King Soopers
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Represented By: Tetyana V. Beschastna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC a Kansas limited liability company doing business as King Soopers
Represented By: Katie Berit Johnson
Represented By: Tetyana V. Beschastna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?