Pirie et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Miles Pimentel and Tammye Pirie
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, The, United States Department of Education, The, Miguel Cardona and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 1:2024cv01662
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/24/2024. Consent Form due by 9/5/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/12/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2024 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
July 24, 2024 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the court sua sponte. This case has been assigned to the AP docket in error. This case does not fall within the scope of cases subject to management as an AP case under D.C.COLO. LAPR 1.1(c) governing cases challenging an action or final decision of an administrative agency. The clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/24/2024. (norlin, )
July 15, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julia M. Prochazka on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party Miguel Cardona(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party Merrick B. Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party United States Department of Education, The(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party United States Department of Justice, The(pty:dft) (Prochazka, Julia)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kendrick D. Davis terminated. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/2024. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
July 10, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Withdrawal of Kendrick D. Davis at Counsel for Plaintiffs Tammye Pirie and Miles Pimentel by Plaintiffs Miles Pimentel, Tammye Pirie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Davis, Kendrick)
July 2, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jrobe, )
June 28, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Department of Education by Plaintiffs Miles Pimentel, Tammye Pirie. (Wire, Clayton)
June 28, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Department of Justice; Office of Violence Against Women by Plaintiffs Miles Pimentel, Tammye Pirie. (Wire, Clayton)
June 28, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Miguel Cardona by Plaintiffs Miles Pimentel, Tammye Pirie. (Wire, Clayton)
June 28, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Merrick B. Garland by Plaintiffs Miles Pimentel, Tammye Pirie. (Wire, Clayton)
June 13, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (efoga, )
June 13, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Original Complaint to Compel Agency Action against Miguel Cardona, Merrick Garland, The United States Department of Education, The United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9732497)Attorney Clayton Earl Wire added to party Miles Pimentel (pty:pla), Attorney Clayton Earl Wire added to party Tammye Pirie(pty:pla), filed by Tammye Pirie, Miles Pimentel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wire, Clayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pirie et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, The
Represented By: Julia M. Prochazka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education, The
Represented By: Julia M. Prochazka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Cardona
Represented By: Julia M. Prochazka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Julia M. Prochazka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Pimentel
Represented By: Clayton Earl Wire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammye Pirie
Represented By: Clayton Earl Wire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?