Martinez v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Martinez
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Jaddou, Rob Mather, Merrick Garland and Andrew Lambrecht
Case Number: 1:2024cv01834
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE The Joint Motion for Administrative Closure [#5 ] is granted. The briefing schedule and all other obligations of the parties in connection with this case are stayed, pending further order of the court. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is closed administratively. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk is directed to close this civil action administratively, subject to reopening for good cause. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/29/2024.(norlin, )
August 29, 2024 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #5 Joint MOTION for Order to Administratively Close Case by Defendants Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht, Rob Mather, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USCIS Rescheduled Interview Notice)(Bobet Rejko, Jane)
August 7, 2024 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Order to Administratively Close Case by Defendants Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht, Rob Mather, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USCIS Interview Notice)(Bobet Rejko, Jane)
July 30, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Bobet Rejko on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jane Bobet Rejko added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Bobet Rejko added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Bobet Rejko added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Bobet Rejko added to party Rob Mather(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Bobet Rejko added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft) (Bobet Rejko, Jane)
July 1, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
July 1, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
July 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht, Rob Mather, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9755797)Attorney Erin C. Richards-Wilhelm added to party Lisa Marie Martinez(pty:pla), filed by Lisa Marie Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit I-130 Receipt Notice, dated 07/12/2019, #3 Summons Summons, AG Garland, #4 Summons Summons, Secretary Mayorkas, #5 Summons Summons, Director Jaddou, #6 Summons Summons, District Director Mather, #7 Summons Summons, FOD Lambrecht, #8 Summons Summons, USAO D. Colorado)(Richards-Wilhelm, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Martinez
Represented By: Erin C. Richards-Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Jane Bobet Rejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: Jane Bobet Rejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Mather
Represented By: Jane Bobet Rejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Jane Bobet Rejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Jane Bobet Rejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?