Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: LT Hospitality Management, Inc., Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC and Peak Management Services, LLC
Defendant: Admiral Indemnity Company and Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03339
Filed: December 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2024 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #24 Minute Order. (tlove, )
December 18, 2024 Filing 26 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #24 minute order filed in this case on 12/18/2024. This case was remanded back to Denver County District Court. Text Only Entry (tlove, )
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company's (Admiral) Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #23 ), in which Admiral consents to this matter being remanded for lack of diversity jurisdiction, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be REMANDED to the Denver County District Court. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/18/2024. (tlove, ) PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER.
December 18, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #15 by Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company. (Baniak, Michael)
December 12, 2024 Filing 22 Utility Resetting Deadlines: Text Only Entry Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2024. Docketed by Clerk to correct Court Calendar. (norlin, )
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #20 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before January 10, 2025. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER> Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/6/2024.(norlin, )
December 6, 2024 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Amended Complaint by Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company. (Baniak, Michael)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #18 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 26, 2024. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/5/2024.(norlin, )
December 5, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Amended Complaint by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Yates, Russell)
December 4, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Russell Yates on behalf of Affiliated FM Insurance CompanyAttorney Ryan Russell Yates added to party Affiliated FM Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Yates, Ryan)
December 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Russell Edward Yates on behalf of Affiliated FM Insurance CompanyAttorney Russell Edward Yates added to party Affiliated FM Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Yates, Russell)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is ORDERED that Admiral shall show cause in writing on or before December 18, 2024 why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If a response is not timely filed, the Court will enter an appropriate order. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/4/2024. (norlin, )
December 4, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerri J. Anderson on behalf of Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC, Peak Management Services, LLC, LT Hospitality Management, Inc.Attorney Kerri J. Anderson added to party Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerri J. Anderson added to party Peak Management Services, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerri J. Anderson added to party LT Hospitality Management, Inc.(pty:pla) (Anderson, Kerri)
December 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC, Peak Management Services, LLC, LT Hospitality Management, Inc.Attorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Peak Management Services, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party LT Hospitality Management, Inc.(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley)
December 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company (Baniak, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Paul Baniak on behalf of Admiral Indemnity Company (Baniak, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Admiral Indemnity Company. (Baniak, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal by Defendant Admiral Indemnity Company (Baniak, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet For Initial Pleading Of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-claim Or Third-Party Complaint upon Admiral Indemnity Company on 11/01/2024. (agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Admiral Indemnity Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company, filed by Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC, LT Hospitality Management, Inc., Peak Management Services, LLC.(agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Admiral Indemnity Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company, filed by Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC, LT Hospitality Management, Inc., Peak Management Services, LLC.(agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (agryan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Admiral Indemnity Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2024CV33224. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10011556), filed by Admiral Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baniak, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael Paul Baniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Russell Yates
Represented By: Russell Edward Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LT Hospitality Management, Inc.
Represented By: Kerri J. Anderson
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sixth Avenue Restaurant Management LLC
Represented By: Kerri J. Anderson
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peak Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Kerri J. Anderson
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?