Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc. v. Technology Solutions Worldwide, LLC
Plaintiff: Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Technology Solutions Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00116
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Timothy P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Jeffrey M. Galen. The document or attachment was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). Moreover, the address on file for attorney Jeffrey M. Galen does not match the address listed in the signature block, counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 01/27/2025. The Parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form [ECF 3-1] on or before April 23, 2025 (two weeks before the Scheduling Conference).The Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on May 7, 2025 at10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. It will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) submit the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format by joint email, copying all Parties, to Chambers at #o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (ggill, )
January 14, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agryan)
January 14, 2025 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10087720)Attorney Jeffrey M. Galen added to party Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Galen, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc. v. Technology Solutions Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Galen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Solutions Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?