CADI US, LLC v. Statebridge Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CADI US, LLC
Defendant: Statebridge Company, LLC, FrontRange Acquisition, LLC, Crestone Holdings, LLC, Kevin Kanouff, David McDonnell, Glenn Robson, David Robertson and Scott Berry
Case Number: 1:2025cv00345
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Timothy P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 03/07/2025. Scheduling Conference on May 8, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. This will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) jointly email a Word copy of the proposed Scheduling Order, copying all Parties, to Chambers at #o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (ggill, )
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/3/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
February 3, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
February 3, 2025 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara for all further proceedings. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
January 31, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Statebridge Company, LLC by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Berry by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kevin Kanouff by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Glenn Robson by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to FrontRange Acquisition, LLC by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to David Robertson by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to David McDonnell by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Crestone Holdings, LLC by Plaintiff CADI US, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
January 31, 2025 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (echa, )
January 31, 2025 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Berry, Crestone Holdings, LLC, FrontRange Acquisition, LLC, Kevin Kanouff, David McDonnell, David Robertson, Glenn Robson, Statebridge Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10125445)Attorney Scott Kent Brown, II added to party CADI US, LLC(pty:pla), filed by CADI US, LLC.(Brown, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CADI US, LLC v. Statebridge Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CADI US, LLC
Represented By: Scott Kent Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statebridge Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FrontRange Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestone Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kanouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Robson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?