Perkins v. Southern New England Telephone Co Inc

Plaintiff: Sharon L. Perkins
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00967
Filed: June 21, 2007
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Janet C. Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 584 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 575 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 575 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/14/2012. (Oliver, T.)
September 27, 2011 528 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 379 Motion in Limine; granting 402 Motion in Limine; granting 407 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/27/2011. (Oliver, T.)
June 1, 2011 361 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 307 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating 338 Motion to Strike as moot. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/1/2011. (Simpson, T.)
January 31, 2011 313 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 287 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/27/2011. (Simpson, T.)
May 21, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 255 MOTION for Protective Order on Defts Written Discovery Demands on All 149 Plaintiffs by Sharon L. Perkins. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/10. (Conrath, S)
May 19, 2010 263 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: granting in part and denying in part 254 Motion to Compel for the reasons stated on the record; taking under advisement 255 Motion for Protective Order. Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2010. Total Time: 1 hours and 50 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (DeRubeis, B.)
November 4, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion Relation Back on FLSA Claims. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/4/2009. (Heard, J.)
February 12, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Denying 61 SNET's Motion to Dismiss; Denying 64 SNET's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/11/2009. (D'Andrea, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Southern New England Telephone Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon L. Perkins
Represented By: Edmond Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?