Doninger v. Niehoff et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Avery Doninger and Lauren Doninger
Defendant: Paula Schwartz and Karissa Niehoff
Amicus Curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of CT
Case Number: 3:2007cv01129
Filed: July 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Mark R Kravitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. After considering Defendant Karissa Niehoff and Defendant Paula Schwartz's Bill of Costs #118 ; Plaintiff Avery Doninger's Objection re: Bill of Costs #119 ; and Ms. Niehoff and Ms. Schwartz's Response re: Objection #120 , this Court holds that $782.82 should be awarded to Ms. Niehoff and Ms. Schwartz, as the disputed fees were for items involved in the summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 6/22/2011. (Crootof, R.)
June 22, 2011 Filing 120 RESPONSE re #118 Bill of Costs filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine) Modified on 6/23/2011 to create link (Falcone, K.).
June 16, 2011 Filing 119 OBJECTION re #118 Bill of Costs filed by Avery Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
May 31, 2011 Filing 118 BILL OF COSTS by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rule, Katherine)
May 18, 2011 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ghilardi, K.)
May 18, 2011 Filing 117 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz against Avery Doninger.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 5/18/2011. (Ghilardi, K.)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. In light of the Second Circuit's Mandate #115 , the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment for Defendants and to close this file. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 5/17/2011. (Hatch-Miller, M.)
May 17, 2011 Filing 115 MANDATE of USCA: It is Hereby Ordered and Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the district court is Affirmed in Part and Reversed in Part, and the case is remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of this court. The Dismissal of Donniger's state claims without prejudice is Affirmed, dated 5/17/2011 #102 Notice of Appeal, filed by Paula Schwartz, Karissa Niehoff, #110 Notice of Appeal filed by Avery Doninger, #103 Notice of Appeal filed by Avery Doninger (Falcone, K.)
February 15, 2011 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Upon entering the survey, all responses are completely anonymous.https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ghilardi, K.)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER. This case has been on appeal since July 28, 2009. See Notice of Appeal #110 . The Court directs the Clerk to administratively close this case, subject to reopening once the Second Circuit issues its decision. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 2/15/2011. (Hatch-Miller, M.)
January 27, 2010 Filing 113 Redaction of #111 Transcript,, held on November 12, 2008 before Judge Mark Kravitz for dates of November 12, 2008 Court Reporter: Thea Finkelstein Type of Hearing: Oral Argument. (Finkelstein, T.)
January 27, 2010 Filing 112 Transcript Redaction Request re #111 Transcript,, by attorney Beatrice S. Jordan. (Jordan, Beatrice)
January 21, 2010 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 12, 2008 before Judge Mark R Kravitz. Court Reporter: Thea Finkelstein. Type of Hearing: oral argument. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2010. (Finkelstein, T.)
July 28, 2009 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #93 Memorandum of Decision; #101 Ruling and Order by Avery Doninger. Filing fee $455, receipt number H028818. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Decision, #2 Ruling and Order)(Grady, B.)
June 15, 2009 Filing 109 Index to Record on Appeal by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz re #102 Notice of Appeal, #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #83 Response, #75 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #107 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), #97 Objection, #96 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, #82 Objection,, #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, #105 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), 78 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #77 MOTION to Amend/Correct #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law, #80 MOTION for Joinder of Avery Doninger as party plaintiff, #100 Reply to Response to Motion, #103 Notice of Appeal, #81 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #87 Amended Complaint, #99 Reply to Response to Motion, #56 Answer to Amended Complaint, #88 Reply to Response to Motion, #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 85 Order on Motion for Joinder,,, #98 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #89 Reply to Response to Motion, #101 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jordan, Beatrice)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Stay Trial. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 05/14/2009. (Hallett, N.)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Ruling and ORDER granting #105 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b; and amending #93 Memorandum of Decision to certify questions contained within this ruling to the Second Circuit. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 5/14/09. (Brown, S.)
May 14, 2009 Filing 106 First MOTION to Stay of Trial on Consent by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz.Responses due by 6/4/2009 (Jordan, Beatrice)
May 12, 2009 Filing 105 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Avery Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
May 7, 2009 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/7/2009. 36 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.)
April 16, 2009 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #101 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Avery Doninger. Filing fee $455, receipt number H028077. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grady, B.)
April 7, 2009 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #93 Ruling granting in part denying in part #73 Motion for Summary Judgment, #101 Ruling denying #95 Motion for Reconsideration denying #96 Motion for Reconsideration by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number N027220. (Brown, S.)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Ruling and ORDER denying #95 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #96 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 3/19/09. (Brown, S.)
March 5, 2009 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to #96 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Jordan, Beatrice)
February 23, 2009 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Avery Doninger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miller Deposition Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Student Handbook Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email)(Schoenhorn, Jon)
February 19, 2009 Filing 98 Memorandum in Opposition re #96 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Avery Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
February 11, 2009 Filing 97 OBJECTION re #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jordan, Beatrice)
January 29, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz.Responses due by 2/19/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration)(Jordan, Beatrice)
January 26, 2009 Filing 95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Avery Doninger.Responses due by 2/16/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Schoenhorn, Jon)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz Trial Brief due by 5/4/2009 Jury Selection set for 6/2/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz Jury Trial set for 6/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 1/23/09. (Malone, P.)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION: Granting in part and denying in part #73 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #74 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 1/15/2009. (Ghilardi, K.)
November 12, 2008 Filing 92 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2008 re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paula Schwartz, Karissa Niehoff, #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lauren Doninger. Taking under advisement #73 Motion for Summary Judgment; taking under advisement #74 Motion for Summary Judgment; Total Time: 2 hours 29 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment: NOTE NEW DATE/TIME. The oral argument that was previously set for 11/6/2008 is reset for 11/12/2008 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 10/28/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
September 30, 2008 Filing 90 Docket Entry Correction re #76 USCA Mandate; added pdf of slip opinion (Inferrera, L.)
September 5, 2008 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Avery Doninger, Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
September 5, 2008 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JJ)(Jordan, Beatrice)
September 4, 2008 Filing 87 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Avery Doninger.(Schoenhorn, Jon)
August 29, 2008 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/29/2008. 3 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.)
August 29, 2008 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2008 (Ghilardi, K.)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. With the consent of the parties and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's Motion to Add Avery Doninger as a Plaintiff #80 . The Motion is granted to the extent that Plaintiff seeks to substitute Avery Doninger as the party plaintiff for Lauren Doninger, P.P.A., since Avery Doninger is now 18 years of age. The Motion is denied to the extent it could be construed as a request to add Avery Doninger as a plaintiff in addition to Lauren Doninger, P.P.A. Plaintiff should file an amended complaint substituting Avery Doninger for Lauren Doninger, P.P.A., no later than September 5, 2008. Once the amended complaint is filed, the Clerk is directed to change the caption of the case on the docket sheet to reflect Avery Doninger as the party plaintiff and should terminate Lauren Doninger, P.P.A. as a party plaintiff. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/29/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
August 26, 2008 Filing 84 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Conference set for 8/29/2008 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the telephone conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. Counsel are ordered by the court to be prepared to discuss the merits of all pending motions. (Carotenuto, R.)
August 21, 2008 Filing 83 RESPONSE re #80 MOTION for Joinder of Avery Doninger as party plaintiff filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rule, Katherine)
August 20, 2008 Filing 82 OBJECTION TO #74 Motion for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lauren Doninger. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Pursuant to Rule 56(a)2, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit SJ-3, #5 Exhibit SJ-4, #6 Exhibit SJ-5, #7 Exhibit SJ-6, #8 Exhibit SJ-7, #9 Exhibit SJ-8, #10 Exhibit SJ-9, #11 Exhibit SJ-10, #12 Exhibit SJ-11, #13 Exhibit SJ-12, #14 Exhibit SJ-13, #15 Exhibit SJ-14, #16 Memorandum in Support of Objection to Summary Judgment)(Schoenhorn, Jon) Modified on 8/21/2008 to create link to motion (Malone, P.).
August 20, 2008 Filing 81 Memorandum in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Local Rule 56(a)2 Statement)(Jordan, Beatrice)
August 20, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION for Joinder of Avery Doninger as party plaintiff by Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Oral argument set for 11/6/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. All persons entering the courthouse must present photo identification. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/15/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court notes the correction on page 1 of #73 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 7/28/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
July 24, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Amend/Correct #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz.Responses due by 8/14/2008 (Jordan, Beatrice)
July 21, 2008 Filing 76 MANDATE of USCA dated 7/21/2008 Affirming #44 Notice of Appeal filed by Lauren Doninger (Falcone, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #1 Slip Opinon) (Inferrera, L.).
July 18, 2008 Filing 75 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
July 18, 2008 Filing 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lauren Doninger.Responses due by 8/8/2008 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Plaintiff's Rule 56(a)1 Statement, #2 Exhibit Summary Judgment Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibit 30)(Schoenhorn, Jon)
July 18, 2008 Filing 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz.Responses due by 8/8/2008 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Local Rule 56(A) Statement, #2 Memorandum in Support of MSJ, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II)(Jordan, Beatrice)
July 18, 2008 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatrice S. Jordan on behalf of Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz (Jordan, Beatrice)
June 11, 2008 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/11/2008. 11 minutes (Ghilardi, K.)
June 11, 2008 Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2008 (Ghilardi, K.)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. The Court having conferred telephonically with the parties on June 11, 2008, dispositive motions, if any, including all motions to exclude testimony of experts pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702-05 and the Daubert v. Merrill Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993) line of cases shall be filed by July 18, 2008. The response shall be filed no later than August 20, 2008, and the reply, if any, is due no later than September 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 6/11/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
June 9, 2008 Filing 69 Joint STATUS REPORT by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 3, 2008 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2008 (Ghilardi, K.)
June 3, 2008 Filing 68 NOTICE. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report (instructions attached) no later than 6/9/2008. Note: The hearing set for June 12, 2008, is CANCELED. (Carotenuto, R.)
March 25, 2008 Set Deadlines: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/11/2008 8:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz Hearing set for 6/12/2008 9:00 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz (Ghilardi, K.)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. The parties should contact the Court within forty-eight (48) hours of any ruling by the Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. A telephonic status conference will be held on June 11, 2008, at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. If needed, the court will hold a hearing at 9:00 a.m. on June 12, 2008, in Courtroom Four. The deadline for the filing of dispositive motions is suspended until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 3/25/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
March 25, 2008 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/25/2008. 21 minutes (Ghilardi, K.)
March 18, 2008 Filing 65 Joint STATUS REPORT by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Gerarde, Thomas)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearance of Attorney Renee C. Redman on behalf of amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Connecticut is terminated. Amicus has continuing alternate legal representation. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 3/12/2008. (Carotenuto, R.)
March 7, 2008 Filing 63 MOTION for Renee C. Redman to Withdraw as Attorney by American Civil Liberties Union of CT. (Redman, Renee)
February 26, 2008 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. McGuire on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of CT (McGuire, David)
February 6, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 3/31/2008 There will be no further extensions of this deadline.(Malone, P.)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2008 to complete discovery. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/08. (Malone, P.)
February 5, 2008 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2008 to complete discovery by Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must answer, object, or respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests on or before December 24, 2007. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 11/26/07. (Morris, D.)
November 21, 2007 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/24/07 to answer, object or respond to discovery by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER withdrawing #53 Motion for Security for Costs; granting #55 Motion to Withdraw #53 Motion for Security for Costs. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 11/2/07. (Carotenuto, R.)
October 31, 2007 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz.(Gerarde, Thomas)
October 31, 2007 Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw #53 MOTION for Security for Costs by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine)
October 24, 2007 Filing 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Form by Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon) Modified on 11/9/2007 correct relief/event (Malone, P.).
October 24, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION for Security for Costs by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine)
October 12, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE by Lauren Doninger of Filing of Amended Complaint (Schoenhorn, Jon)
October 12, 2007 Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Lauren Doninger.(Schoenhorn, Jon)
October 8, 2007 Filing 50 Index to Record on Appeal by Lauren Doninger re #44 Notice of Appeal, #1 Notice of Removal, #37 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #43 MOTION, #21 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #40 Exhibit List, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #39 Witness List, #35 Motion Hearing, #25 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #32 Motion Hearing, #38 Motion Hearing, #34 Motion Hearing, #9 MOTION for temporary injunction, #31 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #27 MOTION for Leave to File, #4 Jury Demand, #42 Exhibit List, #41 Exhibit List. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. CORRECTING DOCUMENT # 49. (Malone, P.)
October 8, 2007 Filing 49 ENTERED IN ERROR Index to Record on Appeal by Lauren Doninger re #44 Notice of Appeal. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Schoenhorn, Jon) Modified on 10/9/2007 to correct links to appeal record to USCA (Malone, P.).
September 28, 2007 CASH, Security for Costs BOND in the amount of $ 500.00 posted by Lauren Doninger Receipt Number R001355 (Carfora, C.)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERTelephonic Status Conference set for 3/25/2008 08:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz.,Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2007.,Discovery due by 3/15/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2008., Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2008.,Trial Ready Date 6/2/2008., Joint Trial Brief due by 6/2/2008. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 9/19/07. (Malone, P.)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s)in the above-entitled case having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/07. (Malone, P.)
September 17, 2007 Filing 46 MOTION for Security for Costs by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine)
September 13, 2007 Filing 45 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rule, Katherine)
September 10, 2007 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #37 Memorandum of Decision denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Lauren Doninger. Filing fee $455, receipt number H023510. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Decision)(Grady, B.)
September 4, 2007 Filing 43 Jury Demand by Lauren Doninger request for a jury trial (Schoenhorn, Jon) Modified on 9/5/2007 to correct text entry (Malone, P.).
September 4, 2007 Filing 42 Marked Exhibit List by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Ghilardi, K.)
September 4, 2007 Filing 41 Marked Exhibit List by Lauren Doninger. (Ghilardi, K.)
September 4, 2007 Filing 40 Marked Court Exhibit List. (Ghilardi, K.)
September 4, 2007 Filing 39 Marked Witness List. (Ghilardi, K.)
August 31, 2007 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz : Motion Hearing held on 8/31/2007 re #9 MOTION for temporary injunction filed by Lauren Doninger. Total Time: 4 hours 44 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Steinberg, C).
August 31, 2007 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/17/2007. (Ghilardi, K.)
August 31, 2007 Filing 37 Memorandum of Decision denying #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 08/31/2007. (entered by Morris, D.)
August 30, 2007 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel : Follow-up Settlement Conference held 3 hours on 8/29/2007. Case not settled. (Urbano, G.)
August 24, 2007 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz : Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2007 re #9 MOTION for temporary injunction filed by Lauren Doninger. Hearing continued to 8/31/2007 at 1:00 PM.Total Time: 6 hours 33 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Steinberg, C).
August 23, 2007 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz : Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2007 re #9 MOTION for temporary injunction filed by Lauren Doninger. Motion Hearing continued to 8/24/2007 at 9:30 AM. Total Time: 2 hours 50 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Steinberg, C).
August 22, 2007 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Colette Redman on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of CT (Rodko, B.)
August 22, 2007 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz : Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2007 re #9 MOTION for temporary injunction filed by Lauren Doninger. Hearing continued until 8/23/07 at 9am. (Court Reporter T. Finkelstein.) (Rodko, B.) (Steinberg, C).
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORAL ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief; denying without prejudice #29 MOTION Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/22/07. (Rodko, B.) .
August 21, 2007 Filing 31 Brief Of Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's re #9 MOTION for temporary restraining Order/Preliminary injunction filed by American Civil Liberties Union of CT. Correcting Document #28 (wrong relief used).(Malone, P.)
August 21, 2007 Filing 29 MOTION for Hearing Oral Argument re #9 MOTION for temporary injunction by American Civil Liberties Union of CT.Responses due by 9/11/2007 CORRECTING DOCUMENT #27(Malone, P.) Modified on 8/23/2007 to correct event/relief (Malone, P.).
August 21, 2007 Filing 28 ENTERED IN ERROR First MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff Attorney Renee C. Redman. by American Civil Liberties Union of CT. (Redman, Renee) Modified on 8/22/2007 to correct event/relief (Malone, P.).
August 21, 2007 Filing 27 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of American Civil Liberties Union of Connecticut Attorney Renee C. Redman. by American Civil Liberties Union of CT. (Redman, Renee) Modified on 8/22/2007 to correct motion event/relief. (Malone, P.).
August 20, 2007 Filing 26 Docket Entry Correction Removed Incorrect PDF with Correct PDF re #24 Witness List (Malone, P.)
August 20, 2007 Filing 25 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,. (Rule, Katherine)
August 20, 2007 Filing 24 Proposed Witness List by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2007 (Malone, P.). Additional attachment(s)
August 20, 2007 Filing 23 Proposed Exhibit List by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Rule, Katherine)
August 20, 2007 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION for temporary injunction filed by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R, pp. 1-12#19 Exhibit R, pp. 13-21#20 Exhibit S#21 Exhibit T#22 Exhibit U)(Rule, Katherine)
August 10, 2007 Filing 21 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Lauren Doninger re #19 Witness List. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
August 10, 2007 Filing 20 proposed Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction by Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
August 10, 2007 Filing 19 Proposed Witness List by Lauren Doninger. (Schoenhorn, Jon)
August 9, 2007 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for temporary injunction. Responses due by 8/20/2007 (Ghilardi, K.)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Plaintiff's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, witness lists, and exhibit lists are due no later than August 10, 2007. Defendants' proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, witness lists, and exhibit lists are due no later than noon on August 20, 2007. The hearing will begin at 9:00 a.m. and conclude at noon on August 22 and 23, 2007, and will continue on August 24, 2007, beginning at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/9/2007. (Carotenuto, R.)
August 9, 2007 Filing 17 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for temporary injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. All persons entering the courthouse must present photo identification. (Carotenuto, R.)
August 9, 2007 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel : TelephonicStatus Conference held on 8/9/2007 for 20 minutes. (Urbano, G.)
August 6, 2007 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz : Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2007. 40 minutes(Court Reporter Finkelstein.) (Ghilardi, K.)
July 30, 2007 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Chinni on behalf of all defendants (Chinni, Christine)
July 30, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2007 at 04:00 PM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the telephone conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. (Carotenuto, R.)
July 27, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz (Gerarde, Thomas)
July 27, 2007 Filing 11 Docket Entry Correction: Document #9 MOTION for temporary injunction has been modified to add PDF. (Grady, B.)
July 27, 2007 Filing 7 Docket Entry Correction: #6 Notice of Pending Motions has been modified to add PDF. (Grady, B.) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (Grady, B.).
July 26, 2007 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support of #9 MOTION for temporary injunction filed by Lauren Doninger. (Grady, B.) Text modified on 7/27/2007 to correct filer (Grady, B.).
July 26, 2007 Filing 9 MOTION for temporary injunction by Lauren Doninger. Responses due by 8/16/2007 (Grady, B.) Text modified on 7/27/2007 to add PDF (Grady, B.). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (Grady, B.).
July 26, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Rule on behalf of Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz (Grady, B.)
July 26, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pending Motions by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz (Grady, B.) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (Grady, B.).
July 26, 2007 Filing 5 Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz (Grady, B.)
July 26, 2007 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karissa Niehoff, Paula Schwartz. (Grady, B.)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER: Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 07/26/07. (Grady, B.)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/26/07.Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2007.,Discovery due by 1/25/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2008. Signed by Clerk on 07/27/07. (Grady, B.)
July 26, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Judicial District of New Britain at New Britain. Filing fee $350 receipt number H023116 filed by Lauren Doninger. (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief#2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal#3 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal#4 Notice of Consent to Removal)(Grady, B.)
July 26, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Judicial District of New Britain at New Britain. Filing fee $350 receipt number H023116 filed by Lauren Doninger. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief# 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal# 3 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal# 4 Notice of Consent to Removal)(Grady, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doninger v. Niehoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Schwartz
Represented By: Christine L. Chinni
Represented By: Beatrice S. Jordan
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Represented By: Katherine E. Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karissa Niehoff
Represented By: Christine L. Chinni
Represented By: Beatrice S. Jordan
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Represented By: Katherine E. Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of CT
Represented By: Renee Colette Redman
Represented By: David J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Doninger
Represented By: Jon L. Schoenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Doninger
Represented By: Jon L. Schoenhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?