Sidell v. Structured Settlement Investments, LP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Scott Sidell alleged that Defendant Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc. d/b/a LawCash, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma and Scott Yucht accessed his private Yahoo e-mail account and monitored his e-mail communications.

Plaintiff: Scott Sidell
Defendant: Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma and Scott Yucht
Case Number: 3:2008cv00710
Filed: May 8, 2008
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Alvin W. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: No cause code entered

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2009 77 Featured Case ORDER: Ordered accordingly 76 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Parties. Signed by Clerk on 11/06/09. (Grady, B.)
November 5, 2009 76 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Parties by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 29, 2009 75 Featured Case ORDER denying 65 Motion to Disqualify Counsel, without prejudice to refiling in a New York court. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/29/09. (Wilson, J.)
June 19, 2009 74 RESPONSE re 72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Scott Sidell. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause, # 2 Exhibit B to Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit B to Affidavit)(Green, Russell)
June 10, 2009 73 AFFIDAVIT re 72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Crossman, John)
June 10, 2009 72 Memorandum in Opposition to Sidell's Response to Order to Show Cause re 65 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
June 3, 2009 71 RESPONSE TO 70 Order to Show Cause, by Scott Sidell filed by Scott Sidell. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause, # 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit B to Affidavit)(Green, Russell)
May 19, 2009 70 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 65 Motion to Disqualify. Plaintiff shall show cause why the motion to disqualify should not be terminated as moot because the arbitration is no longer ongoing. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/19/2009. (Fontaine, L.)
May 1, 2009 69 REPLY to Response to 65 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
April 23, 2009 68 RESPONSE re 67 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Determination on Disqualification filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
April 8, 2009 67 Memorandum in Opposition re 65 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Crossman, John)
April 8, 2009 66 AFFIDAVIT re 65 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Signed By John K. Crossman filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Crossman, John)
March 18, 2009 65 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
January 15, 2009 TRIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Upon entering the survey, all responses are completely anonymous.https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey Dear Counselor:This questionnaire is being sent to you pursuant to the District Court's judicial evaluation program, which gives lawyers an opportunity to make anonymous evaluations of judges before whom they appear.Our records show that you appeared as counsel of record in a civil case assigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant that was recently closed. Please take a few minutes to complete the questionnaire. If you do not have sufficient personal experience to provide an informed response to a given question, or a question is inapplicable for some other reason, please leave the response to that question blank. Do not put your name on the questionnaire or identify yourself in any other way. Please click on the link below to complete the survey: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?surveyThank you for participating in the Court's judicial evaluation program.Very truly yours,Robin Tabora, Clerk of the Court (Grady, B.)
January 15, 2009 64 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 01/15/09. (Grady, B.)
January 14, 2009 63 Featured Case ORDER supplementing Doc. # 62 : In granting the defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the Court noted that the Motion to Disqualify is moot. The facts underlying the disqualification issue arise from the employment relationship and, therefore, disqualification is arbitrable. Because the issue of arbitrability is unrelated to the facts regarding the requested disqualification, the Motion to Disqualify is moot. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/14/09. (Wilson, J.)
January 14, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 26 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. See attached memorandum of decision dismissing case. Accordingly, the motion to disqualify counsel is moot. The clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/14/2009. (Fontaine, L.)
December 3, 2008 61 REPLY to Response to 36 MOTION to Dismiss Sur-Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration or Alternatively to Dismiss filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
November 19, 2008 60 REPLY to Response to 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
November 6, 2008 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time. Reply due 11/19/2008. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/6/2008. (Fontaine, L.)
November 6, 2008 58 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 19, 2008 for Defendants to Reply to 55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Pencu, Alexander)
October 31, 2008 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allison Murray Near terminated. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/31/2008. (Fontaine, L.)
October 30, 2008 56 MOTION for Allison M. Near to Withdraw as Attorney by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
October 29, 2008 55 Memorandum in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss filed by Scott Sidell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Green, Russell) Modified on 10/30/2008 to correct the text (Grady, B.).
October 23, 2008 54 Featured Case ORDER terminating 33 Motion to Compel as a duplicate of 36 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/2008. (Fontaine, L.)
October 23, 2008 53 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion for Order; denying 31 Motion to Compel; denying 46 Motion for Conference; denying 47 Motion for Conference as premature. Defendants contest the Court's jurisdiction to hear this case. Conference on the scheduling issues of this case will not be appropriate until after full briefing and a ruling on 33 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/2008. (Fontaine, L.)
October 17, 2008 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 36 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/29/2008. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/17/2008. (Fontaine, L.)
October 17, 2008 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss until October 29, 2008 by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
October 1, 2008 50 Featured Case ORDER denying 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Discovery is improper before the Court decides the threshold issue of arbitrability. Plaintiff shall file a susbstantive response to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration or dismiss by 10/22/2008. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/1/2008. (Fontaine, L.)
September 17, 2008 49 REPLY to Response to 47 Amended MOTION for Status and Scheduling Conference filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
September 9, 2008 48 Memorandum in Opposition re 47 Amended MOTION for Status and Scheduling Conference filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
September 9, 2008 47 Amended MOTION for Status and Scheduling Conference by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
September 8, 2008 46 MOTION for Status and Scheduling Conference by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
August 25, 2008 45 REPLY to Response to 41 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to conduct discovery as to 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/13/08 filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
August 14, 2008 44 REPLY to Response to 26 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Scott Sidell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Green, Russell)
August 11, 2008 43 AFFIDAVIT re 41 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to conduct discovery as to 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/13/08, 42 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Signed By John K. Crossman filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
August 11, 2008 42 Memorandum in Opposition re 41 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to conduct discovery as to 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/13/08 filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
August 8, 2008 41 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to conduct discovery as to 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss, 36 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/13/08 by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
July 31, 2008 40 AFFIDAVIT re 26 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Signed By John K. Crossman filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D&E, # 3 Exhibit F&G)(Crossman, John)
July 31, 2008 39 Memorandum in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Crossman, John)
July 30, 2008 38 Memorandum in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Adoption of Plaintiff's Rule 26f Report Order filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
July 29, 2008 37 OBJECTION re 31 MOTION to Compel Participation in Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Scott Sidell. (Slossberg, David)
July 23, 2008 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. Responses due by 8/13/2008 (Grady, B.)
July 23, 2008 35 AFFIDAVIT re 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, 36 to Dismiss, 34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Signed By John K. Crossman filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-H)(Crossman, John) Modified on 7/24/2008 to add document number (Grady, B.).
July 23, 2008 34 Memorandum in Support re 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, 36 to Dismiss filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John) Modified on 7/24/2008 to add document number (Grady, B.).
July 23, 2008 33 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, to Dismiss by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht.Responses due by 8/13/2008 (Crossman, John)
July 23, 2008 32 AFFIDAVIT re 31 MOTION to Compel Participation in Rule 26(f) Conference Signed By John K. Crossman filed by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Crossman, John)
July 23, 2008 31 MOTION to Compel Participation in Rule 26(f) Conference by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht.Responses due by 8/13/2008 (Crossman, John)
July 18, 2008 30 MOTION for Adoption of Plaintiff's Rule 26f Report Order by Scott Sidell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Rule 26f Report)(Green, Russell)
July 16, 2008 Answer deadline updated for Structured Settlement Investments, LP to 7/23/2008; Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc to 7/23/2008; Dennis Shields to 7/23/2008; Harvey Hirschfeld to 7/23/2008; Richard Palma to 7/23/2008; Scott Yucht to 7/23/2008. (Wood, R.)
July 16, 2008 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time for the defendants to respond to the complaint, until 7/23/08. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/16/08. (Wilson, J.)
July 15, 2008 28 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 23, 2008 to Respond to Complaint 1 Complaint by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Peloso, John)
July 15, 2008 27 Memorandum in Support re 26 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Scott Sidell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Green, Russell)
July 15, 2008 26 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 26, 2008 25 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 6 Summons Returned Executed Supplemental Return as to Structured Settlement Investments, LP Acknowledgement filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 26, 2008 24 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 10 Summons Returned Executed Supplemental Return as to Dennis Shields Acknowledgement filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 26, 2008 23 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 7 Summons Returned Executed Supplemental Return as to Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 26, 2008 22 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 9 Summons Returned Executed Supplemental Return as to Richard Palma Acknowledgement filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 26, 2008 21 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 8 Summons Returned Executed Supplemental Return as to Harvey Hirschfeld Acknowledgement filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 26, 2008 20 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 11 Summons Returned Executed Supplemental Return as to Scott Yucht Acknowledgement filed by Scott Sidell. (Green, Russell)
June 25, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER RE: Judges Chambers Practices and Standing Orders. Counsel/Parties please see attached order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/25/08. (Wood, R.)
June 23, 2008 18 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/23/2008. (Kunofsky, L.)
June 17, 2008 Answer deadline updated for Structured Settlement Investments, LP to 7/16/2008; Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc to 7/16/2008; Dennis Shields to 7/16/2008; Harvey Hirschfeld to 7/16/2008; Richard Palma to 7/16/2008; Scott Yucht to 7/16/2008. (Grady, B.)
June 17, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 16, 2008 to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/08. (Grady, B.)
June 16, 2008 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 16, 2008 to Respond to the Complaint by Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Peloso, John)
June 16, 2008 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Crossman on behalf of Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht (Crossman, John)
June 16, 2008 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander D. Pencu on behalf of Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht (Pencu, Alexander)
June 16, 2008 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John F.X. Peloso, Jr on behalf of Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht (Peloso, John)
June 6, 2008 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Murray Near on behalf of Scott Sidell (Near, Allison)
May 30, 2008 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Sidell. Scott Yucht served on 5/27/2008, answer due 6/16/2008. (Green, Russell)
May 30, 2008 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Sidell. Dennis Shields served on 5/27/2008, answer due 6/16/2008. (Green, Russell)
May 30, 2008 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Sidell. Richard Palma served on 5/27/2008, answer due 6/16/2008. (Green, Russell)
May 30, 2008 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Sidell. Harvey Hirschfeld served on 5/27/2008, answer due 6/16/2008. (Green, Russell)
May 30, 2008 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Sidell. Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc served on 5/27/2008, answer due 6/16/2008. (Green, Russell)
May 30, 2008 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Sidell. Structured Settlement Investments, LP served on 5/27/2008, answer due 6/16/2008. (Green, Russell)
May 8, 2008 Summons Issued as to Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht. (Torres, K.)
May 8, 2008 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Scott Sidell (Torres, K.)
May 8, 2008 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Atkinson Green on behalf of Scott Sidell (Torres, K.)
May 8, 2008 3 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/8/2008. (Torres, K.)
May 8, 2008 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/8/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2008 Discovery due by 11/7/2008 Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2008. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2008. (Torres, K.)
May 8, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against Structured Settlement Investments, LP, Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc, Dennis Shields, Harvey Hirschfeld, Richard Palma, Scott Yucht ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number B015909), filed by Scott Sidell.(Torres, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidell v. Structured Settlement Investments, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sidell
Represented By: Russell Atkinson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structured Settlement Investments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiff Funding Holding, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Hirschfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Yucht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?