Paul v. Bank Of America

Plaintiff: Joseph L. Paul
Defendant: Bank Of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv01066
Filed: July 16, 2008
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/4/2010. (Kretman, J.)
January 29, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 42 is granted. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 01/29/2010. (Kretman, J.)
July 2, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's deposition will be held on July 21, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., in the Hartford office of Sweeney's firm, Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge, located at 20 Church Street. Due to Moniz's willful failure to supply discovery respo nses, discovery is otherwise deemed closed as of July 1. Counsel for the Defendant is directed to send a copy of this order as well as the deposition notice to Mr. Paul as well as to his attorney. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/2/2009. (Rajendra, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul v. Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Paul
Represented By: Joseph A. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?