Herbert v. National Amusements Inc

Plaintiff: David J. Herbert
Defendant: National Amusements Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv01945
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence regarding sale of theaters to Rave Cinema; denying 69 Motion to Bifurcate. See attached order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/24/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
January 23, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Defendant's Motion in Limine to exclude cat's paw theory of liability. See attached order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/24/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
June 16, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/16/2011. (Fernandez, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert v. National Amusements Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Herbert
Represented By: Thomas W. Meiklejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Amusements Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?