Leniart v. Bundy et al
Plaintiff: George M. Leniart
Defendant: William Bundy, Wilber Blanchette, Michael Hoagland, John Patterson, Marty Graham, Ellison, Larry Bransford, Blais and Jose Cartagena
Case Number: 3:2009cv00009
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Christopher F. Droney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 RULING denying 267 Motion for New Trial Pursuant to FRCP 59 and 60(b)(2). Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 3/30/17. (Esposito, A.)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION re: plaintiff's request for leave to present rebuttal testimony. This memorandum of decision memorializes and supplements the Court's February 12, 2015 ruling announced on the record. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/17/2015.(Katz, Samantha)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial completed on 2/13/2015; Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2015 re 252 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by George M. Leniart. Denying 252 Motion for Directed Verdict; Total Time: 2 hour 11 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: taking under advisement 252 Motion for Directed Verdict; Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2015 re 252 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by George M. Leniart ; Jury Trial held on 2/12/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 2/13/2015 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 5 hours 54 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: taking under advisement 250 Motion for Directed Verdict; Jury Trial held on 2/11/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 2/12/2015; Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2015 re 250 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Michael Hoagland, Wilber Blanchette, Ellison, William Bundy, Larry Bransford. Total Time: 5 hours 23 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RULING re: issues raised in 239 Joint Status Report. See attached ruling for details. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/4/2015.(Katz, Samantha)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 158 156 Motion in Limine. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/17/2013. (Garcia, M.)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RULING denying 96 Motion for Reconsideration but grants plaintiffs Motion for Articulation. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/9/2012. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RULING granting in part 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/26/11. (Johnson, D.)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 47 Motion to Compel; denying 69 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 75 Motion to Compel. See attached Ruling. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on February 28, 2011. (Keefe, B.)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Leave to File; denying 58 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 59 Motion to Amend/Correct. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on December 14, 2010. (Keefe, B.)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend/Correct. See the attached. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on 5/27/10. (Wilson, J.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leniart v. Bundy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M. Leniart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilber Blanchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hoagland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bransford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cartagena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?