Ensign Yachts, Inc v. Arrigoni et al
Plaintiff: |
Ensign Yachts, Inc |
Defendant: |
Jon Arrigoni, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London and Saperstein Agency, Inc |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00209 |
Filed: |
February 4, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Connecticut |
Office: |
Other Statutory Actions Office |
County: |
Fairfield |
Presiding Judge: |
Vanessa L. Bryant |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
No cause code entered |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2012 |
Filing
477
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Lloyds' 432 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part Lloyds' 464 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot Lloyds' 475 Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Prejudgment Remedy. See the attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/24/12. (Ives, D)
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing
440
ORDER denying 426 Motion for New Trial. See attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/2/11. (Hildebrand, J.)
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
338
ORDER denying 224 Plaintiff/Third Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 228 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/3/11. (Engel, J.)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
319
ORDER granting 210 Defendant Lloyds of London's Motion for Summary Judgment. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. The Clerk is directed to terminate Lloyds of London as a defendant to this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/15/11. (Engel, J.)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing
171
ORDER denying 114 Defendant Lloyds of London's Motion for Reconsideration. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/23/10. (Engel, J.)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting 36 Defendant Arrigoni's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendant Saperstein Agency's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 34 Defendant Lloyds of London's Motion to Dismiss. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/11/10. (Engel, J.)
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy as against Defendant Arrigoni and 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Disclosure of Property and Assets as against Defendant Arrigoni. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. The Plaint iff is awarded a prejudgment remedy of attachment and garnishment against Arrigoni in the amount of $728,726.72. Arrigoni shall respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for Disclosure of Property and Assets by November 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/19/09. (Engel, J.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?