Biediger et al v. Quinnipiac Univ Featured Case

Plaintiff: Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker, L. R. and Robin Lamott Sparks
Defendant: Quinnipiac Univ
Case Number: 3:2009cv00621
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: New Haven
Referring Judge: William I. Garfinkel
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: No cause code entered

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/1/2011 (Lewis, D)
April 1, 2011 213 MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference held March 31, 2011. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/01/2011. (Yaster, B.)
March 31, 2011 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/31/2011. 20 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
March 24, 2011 212 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference set for 3/31/2011 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate phone call to chambers (203) 579-5714. (Sbalbi, B.)
February 9, 2011 211 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Follow-up Settlement Conference held on 2/9/2011. Case not settled. No follow-up scheduled. Total Time: 4 hours (Sanders, C.)
February 2, 2011 210 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 183 Notice of Appeal filed by Quinnipiac Univ USCA Case Number 10-3302: The appeal is reinstated. (Lewis, D)
January 28, 2011 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 1/28/2011. Further discussions continued to February 9, 2011 at 2:00PM. Total Time: 5 hours (Sanders, C.)
January 4, 2011 208 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 146 Motion in Limine. Motion decided during pretrial conference held on 6/11/10. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/11/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
December 6, 2010 207 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Follow-up settlement conference continued from January 28, 2010, is set for February 9, 2011 @ 11:00 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 437, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. (Sanders, C.)
December 1, 2010 206 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 183 Notice of Appeal filed by Quinnipiac Univ USCA Case Number 10-3302. The parties in this case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. Each party has submitted a separate electronically signed counterpart reflecting the negotiated terms of the stipulation. (Lewis, D)
November 30, 2010 205 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Follow-up Settlement Conference set for January 28, 2011 @11:00 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 437, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers prior to the conference. THE PREVIOUS ISSUED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER 195 WILL REMAIN IN EFFECT. COUNSEL SHALL SEND TO CHAMBERS AN UPDATED EXPARTE BRIEF WITHIN FIVE BUSINESS DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE. (Sanders, C.)
November 12, 2010 204 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 11/12/2010. Case not settled. Counsel will contact Chambers when they are ready to schedule another settlement conference in this matter. Total Time: 7 hours and 30 minutes (Sanders, C.)
October 20, 2010 203 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. At request of both counsel, settlement conference is rescheduled to November 12, 2010 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 437, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE PREVIOUS ISSUED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER 195 WILL REMAIN IN EFFECT. (Sanders, C.)
October 15, 2010 202 AFFIDAVIT re 181 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Kristen Galles in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Signed By Kristen Galles filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jonathan)
October 14, 2010 201 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/28/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Status Conference. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2011. (Catucci, S.)
October 5, 2010 200 Featured Case ORDER granting 198 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/15/10 to serve and file expense records. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/5/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
October 1, 2010 199 AFFIDAVIT re 181 MOTION for Attorney Fees Signed By Jonathan B. Orleans filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Orleans, Jonathan)
October 1, 2010 198 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2010 (on Consent) to Serve and File the Time and Expense Records of Attorney Kristen Galles 181 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
September 28, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: In Person Conference held on 9/28/2010. 50 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 10/7/2010 to indicate in person conference (Sbalbi, B.).
September 28, 2010 197 MEMORANDUM of Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/28/2010. (Yaster, B.)
September 27, 2010 196 RESPONSE re 182 Notice (Other), 193 Response by Quinnipiac Univ REPLY IN SUPPORT of its Proposed Compliance Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DECLARATION of JOHN McDONALD in Support of Quinnipiac's proposed Compliance Plan, # 2 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of EDWARD A.BRILL certifying that on 9-27-10 Quinnipianc University's Reply in Support of its Proposed Compliance Plan will be sent by email to all parties via the court's electronic filing system.)(Brill, Edward)
September 22, 2010 195 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for October 27, 2010 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER ATTACHED FOR REVIEW. (Sanders, C.)
September 22, 2010 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 9/22/2010. 30 minutes (Sanders, C.)
September 16, 2010 193 RESPONSE re 182 Notice (Other) by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Proposed Compliance Plan. (Orleans, Jonathan)
September 9, 2010 192 Featured Case ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/16/10 to respond to 182 Notice. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/9/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
September 7, 2010 191 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 16, 2010 to Respond to Defendant's Proposed Compliance Plan 182 Notice (Other) by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Hernandez, Alex)
August 26, 2010 190 Index to Record on Appeal by Quinnipiac Univ re 183 Notice of Appeal, 171 Order, 44 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Preclude, Motion Hearing,,,, 149 Exhibit List, 145 Trial Memo, 69 Settlement Conference, 116 Affidavit, 38 Transcript,, 36 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing,,, 97 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 48 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, 131 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 1 Complaint, 139 Stipulation, 144 Protective Order, 159 Bench Trial - Held, 180 Order, 161 Bench Trial - Held, 163 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, 165 Trial Memo, 173 Transcript,, 98 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 34 Order on Motion for Disclosure, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion Hearing,,,, 27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 162 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, 42 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, 167 Response, 118 Affidavit, 68 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 172 Transcript,, 104 Answer to Amended Complaint, 107 MOTION to Certify Class, 35 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 168 Exhibit List, 43 Trial Memo, 181 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 81 Transcript,, 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 58 Settlement Conference, 109 Affidavit, 46 Exhibit List, 86 Transcript,, 47 Exhibit List, 129 Reply to Response to Motion, 150 Memorandum of Conference, 164 Bench Trial - Completed, 156 Bench Trial - Begun, 178 Transcript,, 84 Transcript,, 45 Witness List, 51 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 9 Sealed Document, 137 Order on Motion for Order, 4 MOTION for Waiver of Security, 7 Sealed Document, 85 Transcript,, 176 Transcript,, 175 Transcript,, 143 Memorandum of Conference, 179 Transcript,, 123 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 132 Memorandum of Conference, 157 Exhibit List, 117 Affidavit, 146 MOTION in Limine for an order precluding and elliminating evidence, 82 Transcript,, 13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 174 Transcript,, 158 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Appear, Bench Trial - Held,,, 151 Trial Memo, 40 Notice (Other), 32 Motion Hearing, 111 Affidavit, 136 Joint MOTION for Approving Stipulation to Bifurcate Order, 101 Amended Complaint, 115 Affidavit, 16 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Motion Hearing,,,,,, 94 MOTION for Court approval of proposed Schedule for pre-trial discovery (Exhibit A) and re-set trial date for July 2010 MOTION for Court approval of proposed Schedule for pre-trial discovery (Exhibit A) and re-set trial date for July 2010, 112 Transcript,, 92 Order, 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Hearing, 141 Joint MOTION for Order Approving Stipulated Protective Order Order, 88 Transcript,, 41 Trial Memo, 182 Notice (Other), 22 Memorandum of Conference, 153 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae Attorney John B. Hughes., 102 Exhibit, 72 MOTION to Withdraw Without Prejudice Its Motion Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff Robin Sparks, 28 Trial Memo, 110 Affidavit, 169 Witness List, 25 MOTION for Hearing re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks, 26 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Lopiano, 154 Exhibit, 91 Letter, 128 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 147 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 78 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 8 Sealed Document, 77 Notice, 130 Affidavit, 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 103 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 160 Trial Memo, 24 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 10 Sealed Document, 177 Transcript,, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks, 140 Order, 29 Supplemental MOTION for Disclosure of Potential Witness, 152 MOTION in Limine Defendant's Notice of Motion in Limine, 33 Status Conference, 138 Order on Motion to Certify Class, 87 Transcript,, 83 Transcript,, 142 Order on Motion for Order, 37 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Germaine Fairchild, 39 Notice (Other), 96 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 89 Scheduling Conference, 166 Trial Memo, 30 MOTION to Compel (Letter Re: Work Product Issue Discussed at Pretrial Conference) MOTION to Compel (Letter Re: Work Product Issue Discussed at Pretrial Conference), 14 Affidavit, 100 Status Conference, 73 Order on Motion to Withdraw. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service of Edward Brill Certifying that on 8-26-10 he served the Index to the Record on Appeal Electronically.)(Brill, Edward)
August 25, 2010 189 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for September 22, 2010 @ 1:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 160 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.)
August 24, 2010 188 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/11/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Pretrial Hearing. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (Catucci, S.)
August 23, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 181 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 11/1/2010 (Lewis, D)
August 23, 2010 187 Featured Case ORDER approving 185 Stipulation re briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/23/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
August 20, 2010 186 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 9/28/2010 at 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The parties shall notify chambers before the conference if any attorney wishes to participate by phone. (Yaster, B.)
August 18, 2010 185 Joint STIPULATION for Approval by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
August 16, 2010 184 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/16/2010. (Yaster, B.)
August 16, 2010 183 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 171 Order, 180 Order by Quinnipiac Univ. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number B020150. (Lewis, D)
August 11, 2010 182 NOTICE by Quinnipiac Univ of Compliance with the Court's 7-21-10 order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service of Quinnipiac's Proposed Compliance Plan via email on 8-11-10)(Brill, Edward)
August 4, 2010 181 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks.Responses due by 8/25/2010 (Orleans, Jonathan)
July 22, 2010 180 Featured Case INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/22/2010. (Yaster, B.)
July 21, 2010 179 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/25/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 178 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/24/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 177 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/23/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 176 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/22/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial (afternoon session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 175 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/22/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial (afternoon session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 174 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/22/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial (morning session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 173 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial (afternoon session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 172 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Bench Trial (morning session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010. (Catucci, S.)
July 21, 2010 171 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION following bench trial held June 21-25, 2010. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/21/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 7, 2010 170 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quinnipiac Univ re 162 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Lewis, D)
July 1, 2010 167 Featured Case RESPONSE re 166 Trial Memo by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief. (Orleans, Jonathan)
June 30, 2010 166 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO Defendant's Supplemental Brief Responding to New Arguments in Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by Quinnipiac Univ Estimated trial time 5 days. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Friedfel, Susan)
June 25, 2010 169 Featured Case Marked Witness List by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Sbalbi, B.)
June 25, 2010 168 Featured Case Marked Exhibit List by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Sbalbi, B.) (Main Document 168 replaced on 7/8/2010) (Sbalbi, B.).
June 25, 2010 165 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO /BRIEF by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
June 25, 2010 164 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Bench Trial completed on 6/25/2010. Decision reserved. Total Time: 2 hours and 15 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Catucci.) (Yaster, B.) (Main Document 164 replaced on 7/1/2010) (Sbalbi, B.).
June 25, 2010 163 Featured Case Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Hernandez, Alex)
June 25, 2010 162 Featured Case Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Quinnipiac Univ. (Friedfel, Susan)
June 24, 2010 161 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Bench Trial held on 6/24/2010. Bench Trial continued until 6/25/2010. Total Time: 3 hours and 30 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Catucci.) (Yaster, B.) (Main Document 161 replaced on 7/1/2010) (Sbalbi, B.).
June 24, 2010 160 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO Defendant's Brief in Response to the Amicus Curiae Brief of the United States by Quinnipiac Univ Estimated trial time 5 days. (Friedfel, Susan)
June 23, 2010 159 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Bench Trial held on 6/23/2010. Bench Trial continued until 6/24/2010. Total Time: 3 hours and 15 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Catucci.) (Yaster, B.) (Main Document 159 replaced on 7/1/2010) (Sbalbi, B.).
June 22, 2010 158 Featured Case Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Bench Trial held on 6/22/2010. 152 Motion in Limine denied without prejudice; 153 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae granted. Bench Trial Continued Until 6/23/2010. (Court Reporter S. Catucci.) (Yaster, B.) (Main Document 158 replaced on 7/1/2010) (Sbalbi, B.).
June 22, 2010 157 Featured Case Proposed Exhibit List by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
June 21, 2010 156 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Bench Trial held on 6/21/2010. Total Time: 7 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter S. Catucci). (Yaster, B.) (Main Document 156 replaced on 7/1/2010) (Sbalbi, B.).
June 21, 2010 155 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John B. Hughes on behalf of United States. (Hughes, John)
June 21, 2010 154 Featured Case EXHIBIT Proposed Amicus Brief by United States re 153 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae Attorney John B. Hughes.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Proposed Amicus Brief)(Hughes, John)
June 21, 2010 153 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae Attorney John B. Hughes. by United States. (Hughes, John)
June 21, 2010 152 Featured Case MOTION in Limine Defendant's Notice of Motion in Limine by Quinnipiac Univ.Responses due by 7/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion in Limine To Limit Scope of Testimony of Jeff Webb and Athena Yiamouyiannis, # 2 Exhibit A-B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Brill, Edward)
June 21, 2010 151 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO TRIAL BRIEF by Quinnipiac Univ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brill, Edward)
June 14, 2010 150 Featured Case MEMORANDUM of telephone conference held on June 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/14/2010. (Wolf, S.)
June 10, 2010 149 Featured Case First proposed Exhibit List of Defendant Quinnipiac University, Exhibit B to Joint Pre-Trial Order by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
June 10, 2010 148 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quinnipiac Univ re 146 MOTION in Limine for an order precluding and elliminating evidence, 147 Memorandum in Support of Motion by e-mail to all parties by operation of the Court's electronic filing system (Brill, Edward)
June 10, 2010 147 Featured Case Memorandum in Support re 146 MOTION in Limine for an order precluding and elliminating evidence filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Brill, Edward)
June 10, 2010 146 Featured Case MOTION in Limine for an order precluding and elliminating evidence by Quinnipiac Univ.Responses due by 7/1/2010 (Brill, Edward)
June 10, 2010 145 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO Joint Pretrial Order by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks Estimated trial time 1 week. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit C - Stipulations of Fact and Law)(Orleans, Jonathan)
May 27, 2010 Featured Case Docket Entry Correction re 144 Protective Order to correct pdf. (Lewis, D)
May 27, 2010 144 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/26/10. (Lewis, D) Modified on 5/27/2010 (Lewis, D)TO CORRECT TITLE. (Main Document 144 replaced on 5/27/2010) (Lewis, D).
May 27, 2010 143 Featured Case MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference held May 25, 2010. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/27/2010. (Yaster, B.)
May 26, 2010 142 Featured Case ORDER granting 141 Motion for Order approving Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/26/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 25, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 5/25/2010. 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
May 25, 2010 141 Featured Case Joint MOTION for Order Approving Stipulated Protective Order Order by Quinnipiac Univ., Stephanie Biediger, kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Friedfel, Susan) Modified on 5/28/2010 to add plaintiffs as filers. (Lewis, D).
May 21, 2010 140 Featured Case ORDER approving 139 Stipulation filed by Kristen Corinaldesi, Quinnipiac Univ, Erin Overdevest, Kayla Lawler, Stephanie Biediger, Robin Lamott Sparks, Logan Riker. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/20/10. (Lewis, D)
May 21, 2010 139 Featured Case STIPULATION re: trial procedure by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Lewis, D)
May 20, 2010 138 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/20/2010. (Yaster, B.)
May 17, 2010 137 Featured Case ORDER granting 136 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/17/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 12, 2010 136 Featured Case Joint MOTION for Approving Stipulation to Bifurcate Order by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Quinnipiac Univ, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order re Bifurcation)(Orleans, Jonathan)
April 30, 2010 135 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Berkebile on behalf of Quinnipiac Univ (Berkebile, Rebecca)
April 27, 2010 134 Featured Case ORDER granting 133 Motion for Rebecca L. Berkebile to Appear pro hac vice.. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/10. (Lewis, D)
April 27, 2010 133 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Rebecca L. Berkebile. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B019614. by Quinnipiac Univ. (Lewis, D)
April 26, 2010 132 Featured Case MEMORANDUM of Telephone Conference held 04/20/2010. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/26/2010. (Yaster, B.)
April 20, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Scheduling Telephone Conference held on 4/20/2010. 10 minutes (Sbalbi, B.)
April 9, 2010 131 Featured Case ORDER granting 128 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/9/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
April 7, 2010 130 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 129 Reply to Response to Motion for Class Certification Signed By Alex V. Hernandez filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hernandez, Alex)
April 7, 2010 129 Featured Case REPLY to Response to 128 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 107 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Hernandez, Alex)
April 7, 2010 128 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Hernandez, Alex)
April 6, 2010 127 Featured Case ORDER granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/7/10 to File Response/Reply re 107 MOTION to Certify Class (Responses due by 4/7/2010). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/6/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
April 5, 2010 126 Featured Case Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (On Consent) as to 107 MOTION to Certify Class until April 7, 2010, MOTION for Extension of Time until April 7, 2010 to File Reply to Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
March 31, 2010 125 Featured Case ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/5/10 to reply to response to 107 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/31/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
March 26, 2010 124 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time until April 5, 2010 to File Reply to Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification 123 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Hernandez, Alex)
March 15, 2010 123 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re 107 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Brill, Edward)
March 11, 2010 122 Featured Case ORDER granting 121 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/19/10 to respond to interrogatories and requests for production. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/11/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
March 10, 2010 121 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time until March 19, 2010 (On Consent) to Respond and/or Object to Defendant's Request for Production of Documents dated February 9, 2010 by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
March 8, 2010 120 Featured Case ORDER granting 119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erick Ignacio Diaz Vazquez terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/8/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
March 4, 2010 119 Featured Case First MOTION for Erick I. Diaz to Withdraw as Attorney by Quinnipiac Univ. (Vazquez, Erick)
March 1, 2010 118 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Kristen Corinaldesi filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
March 1, 2010 117 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Stephanie Biediger filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
March 1, 2010 116 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Kayla Lawler filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
March 1, 2010 115 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Erin Overdevest filed by Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, L. R., Lesley Riker, Logan Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Orleans, Jonathan)
February 17, 2010 114 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/15/10 to respond to 107 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/17/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
February 16, 2010 113 Featured Case First MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/15/10 First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 107 MOTION to Certify Class by Quinnipiac Univ. (Friedfel, Susan)
February 4, 2010 112 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/22/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Status Conference. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2010. (Catucci, S.)
February 1, 2010 111 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Alex V. Hernandez filed by Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Logan Riker, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi. (Hernandez, Alex)
February 1, 2010 110 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Jonathan B. Orleans filed by Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Logan Riker, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi. (Hernandez, Alex)
February 1, 2010 109 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 108 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 107 MOTION to Certify Class Signed By Kristen Galles filed by Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Logan Riker, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi. (Hernandez, Alex)
February 1, 2010 108 Featured Case Memorandum in Support re 107 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Logan Riker, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi. (Hernandez, Alex)
February 1, 2010 107 Featured Case MOTION to Certify Class by Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Logan Riker, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi.Responses due by 2/22/2010 (Hernandez, Alex)
January 15, 2010 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/3/10 to respond to interrogatories and requests for production. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/15/10. (Sbalbi, B.)
January 14, 2010 105 Featured Case First MOTION for Extension of Time until Feb 3 2010 First Unopposed Motion for extention of time To Respond to plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions by Quinnipiac Univ. (Friedfel, Susan)
January 13, 2010 104 Featured Case Defendant's ANSWER to 101 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. Defendant's Answer to the First Amended Class Action Complaint by Quinnipiac Univ.(Brill, Edward)
December 11, 2009 103 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/9/09 to file amended complaint and to 1/13/10 for defendants to respond to 101 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/11/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
December 10, 2009 102 Featured Case EXHIBIT 1 Part 1 by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker re 101 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 2)(Orleans, Jonathan)
December 9, 2009 101 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quinnipiac Univ, filed by Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Four, # 3 Exhibit Five)(Orleans, Jonathan)
December 9, 2009 99 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until /with consent of Defendant, nunc pro tunc for a two-day extension, to and including 12/9/09, to file Amended Complaint and By Agreement with Defendant, a two-day extension, to 1/13/2010 to respond to Amended Complaint by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Orleans, Jonathan)
December 3, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 6/15/2010. Bench Trial set for 6/28/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Sbalbi, B.)
November 20, 2009 98 Featured Case CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM re telephone conference held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/19/2009. Discovery and trial dates were reset. 94 Motion for court approval of proposed scheduling order was granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/20/2009. (Yaster, B.)
November 19, 2009 100 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/19/2009. Total Time: 1 hour(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
November 17, 2009 97 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. re 94 MOTION for Court approval of proposed Schedule for pre-trial discovery (Exhibit A) and re-set trial date for July 2010 MOTION for Court approval of proposed Schedule for pre-trial discovery (Exhibit A) and re-set trial date for July 2010 filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Brill, Edward)
November 16, 2009 96 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for waiver of security. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/16/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
November 12, 2009 95 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2009 at 4:30 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Sbalbi, B.)
November 12, 2009 94 Featured Case MOTION for Court approval of proposed Schedule for pre-trial discovery (Exhibit A) and re-set trial date for July 2010 by Robin Lamott Sparks.Responses due by 12/3/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Orleans, Jonathan)
November 6, 2009 93 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference (re discovery schedule) set for 11/9/2009 10:00 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate phone call to chambers (203) 579-5714. (Sbalbi, B.)
October 27, 2009 92 Featured Case ORDER re 78 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Report approved. Discovery shall be completed by 10/1/10 and dispositive motions shall be filed by 11/1/10. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/27/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
October 23, 2009 91 Featured Case Letter from Edward A. Brill Dated 10/20/09 Re: revised 26(f) report schedule. (Candee, D.)
October 23, 2009 90 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Bench Trial set for 5/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Yaster, B.)
October 23, 2009 89 Featured Case Memorandum of scheduling conference held on 10/23/2009 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Bench trial is scheduled to begin May 3, 2010. Parties are requested to confer about dates for motions to join new parties, motions to certify a class, and matters relating to discovery. Total Time: 1 hour (Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Yaster, B.)
October 6, 2009 88 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/14/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 87 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/13/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 86 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Part 4). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 85 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Part 3). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 84 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction hearing (Part 2). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 83 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Part 1). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 82 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/11/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Afternoon Session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 6, 2009 81 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/11/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Jury Trial (Morning Session). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Catucci, S.)
October 2, 2009 80 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 10/22/2009 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Yaster, B.)
October 1, 2009 79 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Susan D. Friedfel on behalf of Quinnipiac Univ (Friedfel, Susan)
September 17, 2009 78 Featured Case REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Orleans, Jonathan)
September 17, 2009 Featured Case Docket Entry Correction - Docket entry 77 Notice modified to indicate correct signature on document. (Candee, D.)
September 15, 2009 77 Featured Case NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Parties are to file a Form 26(f) report by 10/5/09 along with a written statement signed by all counsel and pro se parties explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties' failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/09. (Candee, D.) Modified on 9/17/2009 (Candee, D.).
September 4, 2009 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan D. Friedfel. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/09. (Candee, D.)
August 31, 2009 75 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan D. Friedfel. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B018419 by Quinnipiac Univ. (Candee, D.)
August 17, 2009 74 Featured Case ORDER re (withdrawn) 23 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 25 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/17/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
August 17, 2009 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 72 Motion to Withdraw 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/17/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
August 13, 2009 72 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw Without Prejudice Its 23 Motion Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff Robin Sparks by Quinnipiac Univ. (Gambardella, Mary) Modified on 8/17/2009 to create link to document # 23 (Candee, D.).
August 5, 2009 71 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/05/09. (Shonka, N.)
August 4, 2009 70 Featured Case Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/14/2009 To File Reply 68 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Quinnipiac Univ. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
July 27, 2009 69 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 7/27/2009. Case not settled. Counsel will contact the court for a follow-up. Total Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes (Sanders, C.)
July 24, 2009 68 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks filed by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Orleans, Jonathan)
July 23, 2009 67 Featured Case Acknowledgement of Receipt of Exhibits by Quinnipiac Univ. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 21, 2009 66 Featured Case ORDER granting 65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Attorney Edward A. Brill for Quinnipiac Univ added. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2009. (Heard, J.)
July 21, 2009 65 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Attorney Edward A. Brill. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B018218, by Quinnipiac Univ. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (Heard, J.)
July 17, 2009 Featured Case Acknowledgement of Receipt of Exhibits by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 15, 2009 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/24/2009. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/15/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
July 14, 2009 63 Featured Case Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Opposition) on Consent as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks until July 24, 2009 by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Orleans, Jonathan)
June 24, 2009 62 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 9/2/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Sbalbi, B.)
June 24, 2009 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 59 Motion to Continue motion hearing; granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. (Responses due by 7/15/2009). Motion Hearing is rescheduled for September 2, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/24/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
June 19, 2009 60 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks until July 15, 2009 by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Orleans, Jonathan)
June 19, 2009 59 Featured Case MOTION to Continue /Postpone Oral Argument Re: 23 Motion to Dismiss by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Orleans, Jonathan) Modified on 6/22/2009 to create link to document # 23 (Candee, D.).
June 16, 2009 58 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 6/16/2009. 15 minutes (Sanders, C.)
June 16, 2009 57 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference is scheduled for July 27, 2009 @ 9:30 AM before The Honorable William I. Garfinkel in courtroom 437, 4th Floor, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT 06604. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. PLEASE REVIEW THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER ATTACHED. (Sanders, C.)
June 15, 2009 56 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (Sbalbi, B.)
June 10, 2009 55 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2009 @11:30 AM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.)
June 9, 2009 54 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/9/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
June 9, 2009 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion for referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/9/09. (Sbalbi, B.)
June 4, 2009 52 Featured Case Joint MOTION Reference to Magistrate Judge by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Quinnipiac Univ, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker.Responses due by 6/25/2009 (Orleans, Jonathan)
May 22, 2009 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/22/2009. (Penberthy, Katherine)
May 21, 2009 50 Featured Case ORDER approving Stipulation Regarding Deadlines 49 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/21/2009. (Penberthy, Katherine)
May 20, 2009 Featured Case Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks. (Responses due by 6/26/2008), Set Deadlines:( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/8/2009) (Candee, D.)
May 20, 2009 49 Featured Case STIPULATION Regarding Deadlines by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Quinnipiac Univ, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 19, 2009 48 Featured Case Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Orleans, Jonathan) Modified on 5/20/2009 to create link to document # 2 (Candee, D.).
May 15, 2009 Featured Case Docket Entry Correction re 40 Notice (Other), 39 Notice (Other) MODIFIED TO REMOVE ENTERED IN ERROR TEXT. ENTRIES ARE ACCEPTABLE BY THE JUDGE AS IS (Simpson, T.)
May 15, 2009 Featured Case Docket Entry Correction re 40 Notice (Other), 39 Notice (Other) MODIFIED BOTH ENTRIES TO NOTE DOCUMENTS ENTERED IN ERROR - PER THE LOCAL RULES, DISCOVERY IS NOT TO BE FILED (Simpson, T.)
May 14, 2009 47 Featured Case Marked Exhibit List by Quinnipiac Univ. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 14, 2009 46 Featured Case Marked Exhibit List by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 14, 2009 45 Featured Case Marked Witness List by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Quinnipiac Univ, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Sbalbi, B.)
May 14, 2009 44 Featured Case Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2009 re 26 MOTION to Preclude Testimony, 37 MOTION to Strike, 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhilldenying 37 Motion to Strike; taking under advisement 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 26 Motion to Preclude. Total Time: 1 hour and 25 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
May 14, 2009 43 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO re Preliminary Injunction by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Orleans, Jonathan)
May 14, 2009 42 Featured Case Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Quinnipiac Univ. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 14, 2009 41 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO by Quinnipiac Univ. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Affidavit D, # 5 Appendix E)(Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 14, 2009 40 Featured Case NOTICE by Quinnipiac Univ re 39 Notice (Other) Cross-Designation (Bardavid, Jonathan) Modified on 5/15/2009 (Simpson, T.). Modified on 5/15/2009 (Simpson, T.).
May 14, 2009 39 Featured Case NOTICE by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker (Orleans, Jonathan) Modified on 5/15/2009 (Simpson, T.). Modified on 5/15/2009 (Simpson, T.).
May 14, 2009 38 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/17/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Pretrial Conference. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2009. (Catucci, S.)
May 14, 2009 37 Featured Case MOTION to Strike Testimony of Germaine Fairchild by Quinnipiac Univ.Responses due by 6/4/2009 (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 13, 2009 36 Featured Case Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2009 re 35 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill denying 35 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; taking under advisement 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Total Time: 4 hours and 05 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
May 13, 2009 35 Featured Case ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Quinnipiac Univ.Responses due by 6/3/2009 (Sbalbi, B.)
May 12, 2009 34 Featured Case Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2009 re 29 Supplemental MOTION for Disclosure, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 30 MOTION to Compel. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill granting 29 Motion for Disclosure; denying as moot 30 Motion to Compel; taking under advisement 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Total Time: 4 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
May 11, 2009 32 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2009 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kristen Corinaldesi, Erin Overdevest, Kayla Lawler, Stephanie Biediger, L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Lesley Riker. Total Time: 6 hours and 25 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
May 8, 2009 31 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 4 MOTION for Waiver of Security filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Gambardella, Mary)
May 8, 2009 30 Featured Case MOTION to Compel (Letter Re: Work Product Issue Discussed at Pretrial Conference) by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker.Responses due by 5/29/2009 (Orleans, Jonathan)
May 8, 2009 29 Featured Case Supplemental MOTION for Disclosure of Potential Witness by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Hernandez, Alex)
May 7, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Pretrial Conference held on 5/7/2009. Total Time: 1 hour and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
May 7, 2009 28 Featured Case TRIAL MEMO Joint by Quinnipiac Univ, Stephanie Biediger, Kristen Corinaldesi, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Lesley Riker, Robin Lamott Sparks. (Bardavid, Jonathan) Modified on 5/19/2009 to add filers. (Candee, D.).
May 7, 2009 27 Featured Case Memorandum in Support re 26 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Lopiano filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 7, 2009 26 Featured Case MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Lopiano by Quinnipiac Univ.Responses due by 5/28/2009 (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 5, 2009 25 Featured Case MOTION for Hearing re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks by Quinnipiac Univ. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(S-Candee, D.)
May 5, 2009 24 Featured Case Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 5, 2009 23 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiffs Overdevest and Sparks by Quinnipiac Univ.Responses due by 5/26/2009 (Bardavid, Jonathan)
May 4, 2009 22 Featured Case MEMORANDUM of telephone conference re timeliness of plaintiffs' expert disclosure, as required under Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/4/09. (Candee, D.)
May 1, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 5/1/2009. 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
April 28, 2009 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kristen Galles for L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi and Lesley Riker added. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/09. (Simpson, T.)
April 27, 2009 20 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kristen Galles. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B017790. by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Simpson, T.)
April 23, 2009 33 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/23/2009. Total Time: 1 hour(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
April 23, 2009 19 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Erick Ignacio Diaz Vazquez on behalf of Quinnipiac Univ (Vazquez, Erick)
April 22, 2009 18 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quinnipiac Univ re 14 Affidavit (Bardavid, Jonathan)
April 21, 2009 17 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Trial Brief due by 5/6/2009. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/11/2009 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2009 at 3:30 PM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Sbalbi, B.)
April 21, 2009 15 Featured Case NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference set for 4/23/2009 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate phone call to chambers (203) 579-5714. (Sbalbi, B.)
April 21, 2009 14 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Signed By John McDonald filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
April 21, 2009 13 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Quinnipiac Univ. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
April 20, 2009 12 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Bardavid on behalf of Quinnipiac Univ (Bardavid, Jonathan)
April 20, 2009 11 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Mary A. Gambardella on behalf of Quinnipiac Univ (Gambardella, Mary)
April 20, 2009 Featured Case Summons Issued as to Quinnipiac Univ. (Torres, K.) Modified on 4/22/2009 to edit file date(Torres, K.).
April 17, 2009 16 Featured Case Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2009 re 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Oral ruling issued finding as moot (withdrawn) 2 Motion for TRO; granting 3 Motion for Order to Show Cause. A hearing re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on May 11, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. Pretrial Memorandum shall be due 5/6/09 and a Pretrial Conference shall be held on 5/7/09 at 3:30 p.m., Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd, Bridgeport, CT. 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.)
April 16, 2009 10 Featured Case Sealed Document: Unredacted MOTION for Waiver of Security by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 9 Featured Case Sealed Document: Unredacted MOTION for Order to Show Cause by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 8 Featured Case Sealed Document: Unredacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 7 Featured Case Sealed Document: Unredacted Complaint by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 6 Featured Case Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 7/16/2009. Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2009 Discovery due by 10/16/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2009. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2009. (Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 5 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/16/2009. (Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 4 Featured Case MOTION for Waiver of Security by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker.Responses due by 5/7/2009 (Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 3 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Show Cause by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Appear and Show Cause)(Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 2 Featured Case MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 5/7/2009, ) by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order -Temporary Restraining Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order - Preliminary Injuction)(Torres, K.)
April 16, 2009 1 Featured Case VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Quinnipiac Univ ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number B017758), filed by L. R., Robin Lamott Sparks, Stephanie Biediger, Kayla Lawler, Erin Overdevest, Kristen Corinaldesi, Lesley Riker.(Torres, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biediger et al v. Quinnipiac Univ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Biediger
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Lawler
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Overdevest
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Corinaldesi
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Riker
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. R.
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Lamott Sparks
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinnipiac Univ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?