Aho v. Anthony et al
Plaintiff: Alan Aho
Defendant: Philip Anthony, Normand Sylvestre, Adam Chitteck and Collin Konow
Case Number: 3:2009cv00728
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Christopher F. Droney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RULING granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 7/12/2011. (Gothers, M.)(12 pages)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULING granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 2/28/2011. (Gothers, M.)(9 pages)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: taking under advisement 25 Motion to Dismiss; Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2010 re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Philip Anthony, Normand Sylvestre. 30 minutes(Court Reporter M. Marshall.) (Johnson, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aho v. Anthony et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Aho
Represented By: Robert Carl Zarnetske, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Normand Sylvestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Chitteck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin Konow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?