Thompson v. Rizzitelli et al
Plaintiff: Mel Thompson
Defendant: Sam Rizzitelli, Shelia Parizo, Sandy Watson, James Watson, Dan Sexton, Anita Duggatto, Christine Robinson, Ronald Sill, Joyce Sill, Paul Varsanik, Jr., John Orazietti and Derby Democratic Town Committee
Case Number: 3:2010cv00071
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Presiding Judge: Joan G. Margolis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S BANKRUPTCY. Joint Status Report due by June 28, 2012. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/4/2012. (Rodko, B.)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RULING: granting to the extent set forth in attached ruling 156 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2012. (Rodko, B.)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: granting in part, to the extent that the deposition scheduled for January 17, 2012 is hereby postponed, to be scheduled at a later date pursuant to Court Order 165 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/12/2012. (Rodko, B.)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATIONS FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY AGAINST DEFENDANT CHRISTINE ROBINSON: denying 75 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; denying 81 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; denying 84 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/14/2011. (Rodko, B.)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: granting 111 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall respond on or before September 2, 2011. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/10/2011. (Rodko, B.)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Defendants' Motion 32 to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in Part. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 03/29/2011. (Budris, K.)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SEE ATTACHED ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice as moot Dkt #68 Motion to Dismiss; and granting until 3/31/11, without prejudice to defendants seeking an extension thereof, if Judge Arterton has not filed a ruling by that date, Dkt. #70 Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery (See Attached Electronic Order). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/7/2011. (Watson, M.)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SEE ATTACHED ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER: granting 62 Defendants' Motion for Order such that discovery is stayed until January 18, 2011, without prejudice to defendants seeking an extension (See Attached Order); denying 63 Defendants' Motion for Order (See Attached Order); and denying without prejudice to renew after January 18, 2011 66 plaintiff's Motion to Compel (See Attached Order). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/23/2010. (Watson, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Rizzitelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Rizzitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Parizo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Duggatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Varsanik, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Orazietti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derby Democratic Town Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?