New England Health Care Emp Welfare Fund et al v. iCare Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
New England Health Care Emp Welfare Fund and New England Health Care Emp Pension Fund |
Defendant: |
iCare Management, LLC, Chelsea Place Care Ctr, LLC, Trinity Hill Care Ctr, LLC, Wintonbury Care Center, LLC, Farmington Care Ctr, LLC, Meriden Care Ctr, LLC, Westside Care Ctr, LLC, Bidwell Care Ctr, LLC and Kettle Brook Care Ctr, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00894 |
Filed: |
June 8, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Connecticut |
Office: |
New Haven Office |
County: |
Fairfield |
Presiding Judge: |
Vanessa L. Bryant |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 1145 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
87
RULING granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 81 Motion for Disclosure; denying as moot 82 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy. Defe ndants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the delinquency for the April 2009-September 2009 period, and DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED except with respect to the delinquency for the April 2009-September 2009 period. On or before September 11, 2012, Plaintiffs shall file a damages analysis as described in Part III of the attached Ruling. If they wish, Defendants may file a response to that analysis on or before September 25 , 2012. If Defendants do so, Plaintiffs may file a reply to that response on or before October 2, 2012. See the attached Ruling for further instructions and explanations. The remaining motions have been rendered moot by this decision. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on August 21, 2012. (Caldwell, M.)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing
57
RULING denying Defendants' 52 Motion for Reconsideration, denying in part and granting in part Plaintiffs' 16 Motion to Strike, and deciding the damages for the Court's 48 Prejudgment Remedy Ruling. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on June 29, 2011. (Wilson, D.)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing
48
RULING granting Plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy and denying Defendants' 20 Motion to Stay as moot. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on May 2, 2011. (Wilson, D.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: New England Health Care Emp Welfare Fund et al v. iCare Management, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: New England Health Care Emp Welfare Fund |
Represented By: |
John M. Creane |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: New England Health Care Emp Pension Fund |
Represented By: |
John M. Creane |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: iCare Management, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Chelsea Place Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Trinity Hill Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wintonbury Care Center, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Farmington Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Meriden Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Westside Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bidwell Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kettle Brook Care Ctr, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?