United Technologies Corp. v. Rolls-Royce Featured Case

Plaintiff: United Technologies Corp.
Defendant: Plc Rolls-Royce
Case Number: 3:2010cv01523
Filed: September 27, 2010
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Stefan R. Underhill
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Motion to Stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/18/11. (Sbalbi, B.)
January 13, 2011 40 MOTION to Stay Defendant Rolls-Royce Group plc's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Secton 1659 by Rolls-Royce Group PLC.Responses due by 2/3/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration of Peter Root in Support of Motion to Stay, # 3 Exhibit A to to Declaration of Peter Root, # 4 Exhibit B to to Declaration of Peter Root, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Peter Root)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2011 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Hellman on behalf of Rolls-Royce Group PLC Notice of Special Appearance (Hellman, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2011 38 Summons Issued as to Rolls-Royce Group PLC. Counsel receiving this electronic notice should download the attached summons for service in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4. (Ferguson, L.)
January 5, 2011 37 Summons Issued as to Rolls-Royce PLC. Counsel receiving this electronic notice should download the attached summons for service in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4. (Ferguson, L.)
December 23, 2010 36 STATUS REPORT Re: Service by United Technologies Corp.. (Napp, Andrea)
December 8, 2010 35 NOTICE: Plaintiff shall, by 12/27/10 report to the Court on the status of service of process. In the absence of satisfactory compliance with this Order, the Court shall, by 1/10/11 enter a dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(b) FRCP. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/8/10. (Dismissal due 1/10/11, status report due 12/27/10)(Lewis, D)
November 12, 2010 34 Featured Case NOTICE and ORDER of facts concerning recusal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/12/2010. (Yaster, B.)
November 10, 2010 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip S. Beck on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Beck, Philip)
November 5, 2010 32 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint) (Payton, R.)
November 5, 2010 31 NOTICE by United Technologies Corp. re 30 Amended Complaint (Napp, Andrea)
November 5, 2010 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Rolls-Royce PLC, filed by United Technologies Corp..(Napp, Andrea)
October 25, 2010 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lind on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Lind, Christopher)
October 25, 2010 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Valaik on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Valaik, Michael)
October 21, 2010 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Skiermont on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Skiermont, Paul)
October 21, 2010 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Levine on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Levine, Mark)
October 21, 2010 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamilton H. Hill on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Hill, Hamilton)
October 21, 2010 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L. Peltz on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Peltz, Jason)
October 8, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Michael Valaik for United Technologies Corp. added.. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Michael J. Valaik. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020406. by United Technologies Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Paul J. Skiermont for United Technologies Corp. added.. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Paul J. Skiermont. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020407. by United Technologies Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Jason L. Peltz to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Jason L. Peltz. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020408. by United Technologies Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Christopher J. Lind to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Christopher J. Lind. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020409. by United Technologies Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Mark L. Levine for United Technologies Corp. added.. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Mark L. Levine. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020410. by United Technologies Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Hamilton H. Hill for United Technologies Corp. added.. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Hamilton H. Hill. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020411. by United Technologies Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Philip S. Beck for United Technologies Corp. added.. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/10. (Lewis, D)
October 8, 2010 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Philip S. Beck. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number B020412. by United Technologies Corp. (Lewis, D)
September 28, 2010 9 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Attached Complaint) (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Notice of Appearance filed by United Technologies Corp., 1 Complaint filed by United Technologies Corp., 4 Notice of Appearance filed by United Technologies Corp., 3 Electronic Filing Order, 7 Summons Issued, 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Technologies Corp.. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/27/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 7 Summons Issued as to Plc Rolls-Royce. Counsel receiving this electronic notice should download the attached summons for service in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Technologies Corp.. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Donovan Napp on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Raabe on behalf of United Technologies Corp. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 3 Featured Case ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/27/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 12/27/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2010 Discovery due by 3/29/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2011. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 Filing fee received from Robinson & Cole: $ 350.00, receipt number H031898 (Montgomery, A.)
September 27, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Rolls-Royce, PLC filed by United Technologies Corp..(Montgomery, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Technologies Corp. v. Rolls-Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Technologies Corp.
Represented By: Andrea Donovan Napp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plc Rolls-Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?