Craig v. Yale University School of Medicine et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Craig
Defendant: Yale University School of Medicine, Yale-New Haven Hospital, Errol Norwitz and Julia Shaw
Case Number: 3:2010cv01600
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 84 88 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/04/2013. (Flagg, K.)
May 4, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: granting in limited part 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/4/2012. (Rodko, B.)
December 22, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Yale School of Medicine's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 36] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Yale New Haven Hospital's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 37] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/22/2011. (Flagg, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Yale University School of Medicine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Craig
Represented By: W. Martyn Philpot, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale University School of Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale-New Haven Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Errol Norwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?