Great Northern Ins Co v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Great Northern Ins Co
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01826
Filed: November 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2010 Filing 7 Docket Entry Correction re 6 Electronic Service Documents. Incorrect PDF replaced. (Montgomery, A.)
November 23, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. Counsel receiving this electronic notice should download the attached summons for service in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4. (Montgomery, A.) Modified on 11/24/2010 to correct date (Montgomery, A.).
November 19, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Great Northern Ins Co, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/19/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/19/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
November 19, 2010 Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 2/19/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2011 Discovery due by 5/21/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2011. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/19/2010. (Montgomery, A.)
November 19, 2010 Filing fee received from Law Offices of Stuart G. Blackburn: $ 350.00, receipt number H032292 (Montgomery, A.)
November 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., filed by Great Northern Ins Co.(Montgomery, A.) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/24/2010) (Montgomery, A.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Ins Co v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Ins Co
Represented By: Mark D. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?