Gray v. Commissioner Of Correction

Plaintiff: Bennie Gray, Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of Correction
Case Number: 3:2010cv01998
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: As discussed in the attached Memorandum of Decision, the Court concludes that Plaintiff lacks standing to pursue this action, and judgment is therefore entered in Defendant's favor. The Clerk is requested to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/22/16. (Harris, J)
November 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ELECTRONIC ORDER instructing plaintiff's counsel to serve his initial Requests to Admit, with an emphasis on factual issues, on defense counsel on or before December 1, 2014, and instructing defense counsel to respond on or before January 9, 2015 (see attached). Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/18/14.(Malone, A.)
May 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Reconsideration and restoring this case to the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/23/2014. (Morril, Gregory)
March 31, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendant's Motion 17 for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Because this case is now ready for a trial on the question of whether Mr. Gray was constitutionally denied access to court, for which Mr. Gray will need counsel, the case will be administratively closed to permit the appointment of pro bono counsel. It will be restored to the active docket on motion of either party filed within thirty days of the appearance of counsel for Plaintiff, or on motion of a party showing necessary further action by the Court. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/30/2014. (Morril, Gregory)
July 11, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court PRISCS - INITIAL REVIEW ORDER, Answer updated for Commissioner of Correction to 9/20/2011., ( Discovery due by 3/25/2012, Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2012). Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/11/11. (Corriette, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Commissioner Of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?