Cutler v. New Haven et al

Plaintiff: Jason L. Cutler
Defendant: John DeStefano and City of New Haven
Case Number: 3:2011cv00662
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Warren W. Eginton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/29/2013. (Ghilardi, K.)
July 31, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 MOTION for Protective Order to prohibit the deposition by John DeStefano, City of New Haven in accordance with this ruling and reasonable limits placed on the deposition. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 7/31/12. (Esposito, A.)
December 12, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/9/2011. (Candee, D.)
October 6, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may replead his complaint within twenty-one days of this order's filing date consistent with this ruling. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/4/2011. (Candee, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutler v. New Haven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DeStefano
Represented By: Victor A. Bolden
Represented By: Vikki Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Haven
Represented By: Vikki Cooper
Represented By: Victor A. Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Cutler
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?